Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Alachua County Courts on 04/17/2021 at 15:02:19 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA -VS- WILLIAMS, SHAUN DEMETRIUS

Case Summary

On 04/03/2021 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against WILLIAMS, SHAUN DEMETRIUS. This case was filed in Alachua County Courts, Alachua County Criminal Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***************96 A

  • Filing Date:

    04/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Alachua County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alachua County Criminal Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Alachua, Florida

 

Party Details

Defendant

WILLIAMS, SHAUN DEMETRIUS

Williston, FL 32696

Not Yet Classified

ALACHUA, FELONY DRUG DIVISION

Gainesville, FL 32601

MCCAIN, ANDREW

Gainesville, FL 32601

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Yet Classified Attorneys

ALACHUA, FELONY DRUG DIVISION

120 W University Ave

Gainesville, FL 32601

MCCAIN, ANDREW

120 W University Ave

Gainesville, FL 32601

 

Court Documents

EMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

04/09/2021: EMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

04/05/2021: FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

ARREST FORM (DUPLICATE COPY)

04/05/2021: ARREST FORM (DUPLICATE COPY)

FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

04/04/2021: FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

ARREST FORM

04/04/2021: ARREST FORM

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketARREST FORM (DUPLICATE COPY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2021
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE CRIMINAL HISTORY; SUMMARY - SEE LAST PAGE OF FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketARREST FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MCCAIN, ANDREW