This case was last updated from Alachua County Courts on 08/19/2021 at 02:32:45 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA -VS- WILLIAMS, NICOLAS ELIJAH

Case Summary

On 04/11/2021 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against WILLIAMS, NICOLAS ELIJAH. This case was filed in Alachua County Courts, Alachua County Criminal Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***************86 A

  • Filing Date:

    04/11/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Courthouse:

    Alachua County Criminal Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Alachua, Florida

 

Party Details

Defendant

WILLIAMS, NICOLAS ELIJAH

Gainesville, FL 32641

Not Yet Classified

CHIN, ASHLEY

Gainesville, FL 32601

RUSSANO, CELESTE

Gainesville, FL 32601

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

KELLEY, AARON J

151 Sw 2Nd Ave

Gainesville, FL 32601

Not Yet Classified Attorneys

CHIN, ASHLEY

120 W. University Ave

Gainesville, FL 32601

RUSSANO, CELESTE

120 W. University Ave

Gainesville, FL 32601

 

Court Documents

INFORMATION FILED

05/06/2021: INFORMATION FILED

WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY

04/16/2021: WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY

EMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

04/15/2021: EMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

04/13/2021: NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

STANDING NO CONTACT ORDER PER AO 4.17

04/12/2021: STANDING NO CONTACT ORDER PER AO 4.17

FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

04/12/2021: FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

ARREST FORM

04/12/2021: ARREST FORM

ORDER ON REQUEST FOR APPOINTMENT OF PUBLIC DEFENDER AND DETERMINATION OF CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS

04/12/2021: ORDER ON REQUEST FOR APPOINTMENT OF PUBLIC DEFENDER AND DETERMINATION OF CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketCase Transferred; New case: 2021 MM 000889 A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • ChargeBATTERY: TOUCH OR STRIKE; Charge: 3; Phase: PROS; Disposition: Transferred to Another Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • ChargeBATTERY: ON OFFICER FIREFIGHTER EMT ETC; Charge: 2; Phase: PROS; Disposition: NO ACTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • ChargeRESIST OFFICER-WITH VIOLENCE; Charge: 1; Phase: PROS; Disposition: Transferred to Another Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • DocketOBTS PRE-COURT ENTRY; Count: 2; PROSECUTOR PHASE; Charge Status: Same; Final Decision Date: 05/06/2021; Final Action: No Action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINFORMATION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTANDING NO CONTACT ORDER PER AO 4.17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE CRIMINAL HISTORY; SUMMARY - SEE LAST PAGE OF FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketPROVISIONAL ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketARREST FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketASSESSMENT - CF $50 INDIGENCE APPLICATION FEE; Amount: $50.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ON REQUEST FOR APPOINTMENT OF PUBLIC DEFENDER AND DETERMINATION OF CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2021
  • FinancialTotal Fee Owed: $50.00; Total Fee Paid: $0.00; Total Fee Dismissed: $50.00; Total Fee Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer CHIN, ASHLEY