Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Alachua County Courts on 03/19/2020 at 08:41:01 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA -VS- WILLIAMS III, VINCENT IVANHOE

Case Summary

On 01/05/2020 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against WILLIAMS III, VINCENT IVANHOE. This case was filed in Alachua County Courts, Alachua County Criminal Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***************71 A

  • Filing Date:

    01/05/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Alachua County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alachua County Criminal Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Alachua, Florida

 

Party Details

Defendant

WILLIAMS III, VINCENT IVANHOE

Gainesville, FL 32609

Not Yet Classified

SMITH, DYLAN

Gainesville, FL 32601

MCCLOUD, TONETTE

Gainesville, FL 32609

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

TAT, SARA T

151 Sw 2Nd Ave

Gainesville, FL 32601

Not Yet Classified Attorney

SMITH, DYLAN

120 W University Ave

Gainesville, FL 32601

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

01/06/2020: NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

01/05/2020: FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

STANDING NO CONTACT ORDER PER AO 4.17

01/05/2020: STANDING NO CONTACT ORDER PER AO 4.17

EMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

01/10/2020: EMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

ARREST FORM

01/05/2020: ARREST FORM

SURETY BOND

01/13/2020: SURETY BOND

SURETY BOND

01/13/2020: SURETY BOND

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/13/2020
  • DocketARREST BOND ENTRY; ; Arrest Bond Added to Case with: ; Arrest Date: 01/04/2020 ; Initial Charge #: 2 ; Initial Action Code: ; Prosecutor Count #: ; Prosecutor Action Code: ; Custody Location: SURETY BOND ; Bond Status: Open ; Status Date: 01/10/2020 ; Bond Type: SURETY BOND ; Bond/Pwr No.: PSE5132579 ; Bond Amount: $5000 ; Bonding Co.: TONETTE MCCLOUD BAIL BONDS ; Cash Depositor: ;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSURETY BOND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • DocketARREST BOND ENTRY; ; Arrest Bond Added to Case with: ; Arrest Date: 01/04/2020 ; Initial Charge #: 1 ; Initial Action Code: ; Prosecutor Count #: ; Prosecutor Action Code: ; Custody Location: SURETY BOND ; Bond Status: Open ; Status Date: 01/10/2020 ; Bond Type: SURETY BOND ; Bond/Pwr No.: PSE5132578 ; Bond Amount: $5000 ; Bonding Co.: TONETTE MCCLOUD BAIL BONDS ; Cash Depositor: ;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSURETY BOND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • BondCharge Number: 2; Bond Type: SURETY BOND; Bond Amount: $5,000.00; Power Number: PSE5132579; Bond Status: Open; Bonding Company: TONETTE MCCLOUD BAIL BONDS; Insurance Company: PALMETTO SURETY CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • BondCharge Number: 1; Bond Type: SURETY BOND; Bond Amount: $5,000.00; Power Number: PSE5132578; Bond Status: Open; Bonding Company: TONETTE MCCLOUD BAIL BONDS; Insurance Company: PALMETTO SURETY CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTANDING NO CONTACT ORDER PER AO 4.17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2020
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE CRIMINAL HISTORY; SUMMARY - SEE LAST PAGE OF FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2020
  • DocketPROVISIONAL ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketARREST FORM

    Read MoreRead Less