Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Alachua County Courts on 04/14/2021 at 15:01:05 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA -VS- WILLIAMS III, NATHANIEL DESHAUN

Case Summary

On 03/31/2021 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against WILLIAMS III, NATHANIEL DESHAUN. This case was filed in Alachua County Courts, Alachua County Criminal Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***************57 A

  • Filing Date:

    03/31/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Alachua County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alachua County Criminal Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Alachua, Florida

 

Party Details

Defendants

WILLIAMS III, NATHANIEL DESHAUN

Gainesville, FL 32608

WILLIAMS, NATHAN

Gainesville, FL 32608

>>WILLIAMS, NATHANIEL DESHA

Gainesville, FL 32608

Not Yet Classified

MCCAIN, ANDREW

Gainesville, FL 32601

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Goldman, Canaan

151 Sw 2Nd Ave

Gainesville, FL 32601

HINES ESQ, MICHAEL B.

317 Ne 1St Street

Gainesville, FL 32601

Not Yet Classified Attorney

MCCAIN, ANDREW

120 W University Ave

Gainesville, FL 32601

 

Court Documents

ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO WITHDRAW & APPOINTING CONFLICT ATTORNEY

04/09/2021: ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO WITHDRAW & APPOINTING CONFLICT ATTORNEY

CERTIFICATION OF CONFLICT OF INTEREST BETWEEN THE DEFENDANTS

04/08/2021: CERTIFICATION OF CONFLICT OF INTEREST BETWEEN THE DEFENDANTS

MOTION TO WITHDRAW

04/08/2021: MOTION TO WITHDRAW

ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO WITHDRAW AND APPOINTING REGIONAL COUNSEL

04/07/2021: ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO WITHDRAW AND APPOINTING REGIONAL COUNSEL

CERTIFICATION OF CONFLICT OF INTEREST BETWEEN THE DEFENDANTS

04/06/2021: CERTIFICATION OF CONFLICT OF INTEREST BETWEEN THE DEFENDANTS

MOTION TO WITHDRAW

04/06/2021: MOTION TO WITHDRAW

EMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

04/05/2021: EMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

STANDING NO CONTACT ORDER PER AO 4.17

03/31/2021: STANDING NO CONTACT ORDER PER AO 4.17

FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

03/31/2021: FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

ARREST FORM

03/31/2021: ARREST FORM

ORDER ON REQUEST FOR APPOINTMENT OF PUBLIC DEFENDER AND DETERMINATION OF CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS

03/31/2021: ORDER ON REQUEST FOR APPOINTMENT OF PUBLIC DEFENDER AND DETERMINATION OF CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER GRANTING MOTION TO WITHDRAW & APPOINTING CONFLICT ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATION OF CONFLICT OF INTEREST BETWEEN THE DEFENDANTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO WITHDRAW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER GRANTING MOTION TO WITHDRAW AND APPOINTING REGIONAL COUNSEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATION OF CONFLICT OF INTEREST BETWEEN THE DEFENDANTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO WITHDRAW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • FinancialTotal Fee Owed: $50.00; Total Fee Paid: $0.00; Total Fee Dismissed: $0.00; Total Fee Due: $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTANDING NO CONTACT ORDER PER AO 4.17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • DocketPROVISIONAL ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketARREST FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ON REQUEST FOR APPOINTMENT OF PUBLIC DEFENDER AND DETERMINATION OF CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • DocketASSESSMENT - CF $50 INDIGENCE APPLICATION FEE; Amount: $50.00; Amount Due: $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MCCAIN, ANDREW