Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Alachua County Courts on 02/03/2020 at 14:44:39 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA -VS- WIGGINS, TYRONZO D

Case Summary

On 03/04/2017 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against WIGGINS, TYRONZO D. This case was filed in Alachua County Courts, Alachua County Criminal Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***************95 A

  • Filing Date:

    03/04/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Alachua County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alachua County Criminal Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Alachua, Florida

 

Party Details

Defendant

WIGGINS, TYRONZO D

Gainesville, FL 32641

Not Yet Classified

MARGULIES, DAVID

Gainesville, FL 32601

JAMES, CHARLENE

Williston, FL 32696

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

SILVERMAN, JOSHUA M

4001 W Newberry Rd Ste A-1

Gainesville, FL 32607

Not Yet Classified Attorney

MARGULIES, DAVID

120 W University Ave

Gainesville, FL 32601

 

Court Documents

CERTIFICATE OF CANCELLATION

06/05/2017: CERTIFICATE OF CANCELLATION

CASE ACTION REPORT: NOLLE/NO INFO FILED

05/31/2017: CASE ACTION REPORT: NOLLE/NO INFO FILED

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (JOSHUA SILVERMAN), WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY AND DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY

03/15/2017: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (JOSHUA SILVERMAN), WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY AND DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY

ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO WITHDRAW & APPOINTING CONFLICT ATTORNEY (JOSH SILVERMAN)// MOSELEY

03/14/2017: ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO WITHDRAW & APPOINTING CONFLICT ATTORNEY (JOSH SILVERMAN)// MOSELEY

CERTIFICATION OF CONFLICT OF INTEREST BETWEEN THE DEFENDANTS

03/10/2017: CERTIFICATION OF CONFLICT OF INTEREST BETWEEN THE DEFENDANTS

MOTION TO WITHDRAW

03/10/2017: MOTION TO WITHDRAW

EMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

03/09/2017: EMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO WITHDRAW AND APPOINTING REGIONAL COUNSEL // MOSELEY

03/08/2017: ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO WITHDRAW AND APPOINTING REGIONAL COUNSEL // MOSELEY

MOTION TO WITHDRAW

03/07/2017: MOTION TO WITHDRAW

CERTIFICATION OF CONFLICT OF INTEREST BETWEEN THE DEFENDANTS

03/07/2017: CERTIFICATION OF CONFLICT OF INTEREST BETWEEN THE DEFENDANTS

SURETY BOND

03/06/2017: SURETY BOND

STANDING NO CONTACT ORDER PER AO 4.17

03/04/2017: STANDING NO CONTACT ORDER PER AO 4.17

FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

03/04/2017: FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

ARREST FORM

03/04/2017: ARREST FORM

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF CANCELLATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2017
  • ChargeROBBERY: NO FIREARM OR WEAPON; Charge: 1; Phase: PROS; Disposition: NO INFO VICTIM DOES NOT WISH TO PROSECUTE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2017
  • BondCharge Number: 1; Bond Type: SURETY BOND; Bond Amount: $25,000.00; Power Number: 2017DD002885; Bond Status: Released; Bonding Company: CJ'S BAIL BONDS; Insurance Company: LEXINGTON NATIONAL INS CORP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE ACTION REPORT: NOLLE/NO INFO FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2017
  • DocketOBTS PRE-COURT ENTRY; Count: 1; PROSECUTOR PHASE; Charge Status: Same; Final Decision Date: 05/31/2017; Final Action: B1 NO INFO VICTIM DOES NOT WISH TO PROSECUTE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2017
  • DocketARREST BOND ENTRY; ; Ref: Bond/Pwr No.: 2017DD002885 ; Initial Charge #: 1 ; Initial Action Code: ROBBERY: NO FIREARM OR WEAPON ; Prosecutor Count #: ; Prosecutor Action Code: ; Bonding Co.: CJ'S BAIL BONDS ; Bond Amount: $25000 ; The following field(s) on arrest bond 1 have been modified: ; New Bond Status Added: Released ; New Bond Status Date Added: 05/31/2017 ;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE (JOSHUA SILVERMAN), WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY AND DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER GRANTING MOTION TO WITHDRAW & APPOINTING CONFLICT ATTORNEY (JOSH SILVERMAN)// MOSELEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATION OF CONFLICT OF INTEREST BETWEEN THE DEFENDANTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO WITHDRAW

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 03/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO WITHDRAW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATION OF CONFLICT OF INTEREST BETWEEN THE DEFENDANTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2017
  • DocketARREST BOND ENTRY; ; Arrest Bond Added to Case with: ; Arrest Date: 03/04/2017 ; Initial Charge #: 1 ; Initial Action Code: ; Prosecutor Count #: ; Prosecutor Action Code: ; Custody Location: SURETY BOND ; Bond Status: Open ; Status Date: 03/04/2017 ; Bond Type: SURETY BOND ; Bond/Pwr No.: 2017DD002885 ; Bond Amount: $25000 ; Bonding Co.: CJ'S BAIL BONDS ; Cash Depositor: ;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSURETY BOND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2017
  • BondCharge Number: 1; Bond Type: SURETY BOND; Bond Amount: $25,000.00; Power Number: 2017DD002885; Bond Status: Open; Bonding Company: CJ'S BAIL BONDS; Insurance Company: LEXINGTON NATIONAL INS CORP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTANDING NO CONTACT ORDER PER AO 4.17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2017
  • DocketPROVISIONAL ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2017
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE CRIMINAL HISTORY; SUMMARY - SEE LAST PAGE OF FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketARREST FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer SILVERMAN, JOSHUA M