Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Alachua County Courts on 02/05/2020 at 22:05:38 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA -VS- WATTS III, LARRY EUGENE

Case Summary

On 06/19/2017 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against WATTS III, LARRY EUGENE. This case was filed in Alachua County Courts, Alachua County Criminal Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DAVIS, WILLIAM E. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***************79 A

  • Filing Date:

    06/19/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Alachua County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alachua County Criminal Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Alachua, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DAVIS, WILLIAM E

 

Party Details

Defendant

WATTS III, LARRY EUGENE

Palatka, FL 32177

Not Yet Classified

RAMSEY, JONATHAN D

Gainesville, FL 32601

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

BROLING, JOHN L

Office Of The Regional Counsel, 235 South Main Street

Gainesville, FL 32601

Not Yet Classified Attorney

RAMSEY, JONATHAN D

120 W University Ave

Gainesville, FL 32601

 

Court Documents

RECOGNIZANCE RELEASE TO SUPERVISION OF COURT SERVICES

07/07/2017: RECOGNIZANCE RELEASE TO SUPERVISION OF COURT SERVICES

ORDER REDUCING BOND // MOSELEY

07/06/2017: ORDER REDUCING BOND // MOSELEY

COURT ACTION MEMO

07/06/2017: COURT ACTION MEMO

EMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

06/29/2017: EMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

NOTICE OF HEARING (AMENDED)

06/29/2017: NOTICE OF HEARING (AMENDED)

MOTION FOR BOND REDUCTION

06/29/2017: MOTION FOR BOND REDUCTION

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY AND DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY

06/27/2017: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY AND DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY

MOTION TO WITHDRAW

06/26/2017: MOTION TO WITHDRAW

CERTIFICATION OF CONFLICT OF INTEREST BETWEEN THE DEFENDANTS

06/26/2017: CERTIFICATION OF CONFLICT OF INTEREST BETWEEN THE DEFENDANTS

ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO WITHDRAW AND APPOINTING REGIONAL COUNSEL // MOSELEY

06/23/2017: ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO WITHDRAW AND APPOINTING REGIONAL COUNSEL // MOSELEY

WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY

06/21/2017: WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY

NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

06/21/2017: NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENT STATUS (INDIGENT)

06/20/2017: AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENT STATUS (INDIGENT)

STANDING NO CONTACT ORDER PER AO 4.17

06/19/2017: STANDING NO CONTACT ORDER PER AO 4.17

FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

06/19/2017: FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

ARREST FORM

06/19/2017: ARREST FORM

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/20/2017
  • ChargeLARC: GRAND THEFT 300 LESS THAN 5K DOLS; Charge: 2; Phase: PROS; Disposition: Transferred to Another Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • ChargeBURGL: OCCUPIED DWELLING STATE OF EMERGENCY; Charge: 1; Phase: PROS; Disposition: Transferred to Another Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • DocketCase Transferred; New case: 2017 CF 002275 B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRECOGNIZANCE RELEASE TO SUPERVISION OF COURT SERVICES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2017
  • HearingBond Hearing; Judge: DAVIS, WILLIAM E; Result: HELD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER REDUCING BOND // MOSELEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT ACTION MEMO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING (AMENDED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR BOND REDUCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 06/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2017
  • DocketASSESSMENT - CF $50 INDIGENCE APPLICATION FEE; Amount: $50.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENT STATUS (INDIGENT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2017
  • FinancialTotal Fee Owed: $50.00; Total Fee Paid: $0.00; Total Fee Dismissed: $50.00; Total Fee Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTANDING NO CONTACT ORDER PER AO 4.17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2017
  • DocketPROVISIONAL ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2017
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE CRIMINAL HISTORY; SUMMARY - SEE LAST PAGE OF FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketARREST FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer RAMSEY, JONATHAN D