Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Alachua County Courts on 04/19/2021 at 16:08:32 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA -VS- WATSON, BELLA ANN

Case Summary

On 03/22/2021 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against WATSON, BELLA ANN. This case was filed in Alachua County Courts, Alachua County Criminal Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are GREEN, WALTER M and DAVIS, WILLIAM E. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***************44 A

  • Filing Date:

    03/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Alachua County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alachua County Criminal Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Alachua, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

GREEN, WALTER M

DAVIS, WILLIAM E

 

Party Details

Defendants

WATSON, BELLA ANN

Gainesville, FL 32609

WATSON, BELLA

Gainesville, FL 32609

Not Yet Classified

ALACHUA, FELONY DRUG DIVISION

Gainesville, FL 32601

THOMAS, SEAN R

Gainesville, FL 32601

PICKENS, KRISTIN S

Gainesville, FL 32601

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

KELLEY, AARON J

151 Sw 2Nd Ave

Gainesville, FL 32601

Not Yet Classified Attorneys

ALACHUA, FELONY DRUG DIVISION

120 W University Ave

Gainesville, FL 32601

PICKENS, KRISTIN S

120 W University Ave

Gainesville, FL 32601

 

Court Documents

NOTICE ISSUED TO ATTORNEY FOR DEFENDANT

04/14/2021: NOTICE ISSUED TO ATTORNEY FOR DEFENDANT

NOTICE ISSUED TO BOND AGENT

04/13/2021: NOTICE ISSUED TO BOND AGENT

NOTICE ISSUED TO DEFENDANT

04/13/2021: NOTICE ISSUED TO DEFENDANT

COURT ACTION MEMO

04/09/2021: COURT ACTION MEMO

INFORMATION FILED

04/09/2021: INFORMATION FILED

EMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

03/31/2021: EMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY

03/26/2021: WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY

NOTICE ISSUED TO BOND AGENT

03/25/2021: NOTICE ISSUED TO BOND AGENT

NOTICE ISSUED TO DEFENDANT

03/25/2021: NOTICE ISSUED TO DEFENDANT

SURETY BOND

03/24/2021: SURETY BOND

NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

03/23/2021: NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

ORDER ON REQUEST FOR APPOINTMENT OF PUBLIC DEFENDER AND DETERMINATION OF CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS

03/23/2021: ORDER ON REQUEST FOR APPOINTMENT OF PUBLIC DEFENDER AND DETERMINATION OF CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS

STANDING NO CONTACT ORDER PER AO 4.17

03/23/2021: STANDING NO CONTACT ORDER PER AO 4.17

FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

03/23/2021: FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

ARREST FORM

03/23/2021: ARREST FORM

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/07/2021
  • HearingCase Management; Judge: DAVIS, WILLIAM E

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • HearingArraignment; Judge: DAVIS, WILLIAM E; Result: EVENT CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • HearingDrug Court Hearing; Judge: GREEN, WALTER M

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE ISSUED TO ATTORNEY FOR DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE ISSUED TO BOND AGENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE ISSUED TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketCRIMINAL COURT EVENT SET; Event: Drug Court Hearing ; Date: 04/23/2021 Time: 10:00 am ; Judge: COUNTY, DIVISION 3 CRIMINAL Location: CJC Courtroom 1-B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketCRIMINAL COURT EVENT SET; Event: Case Management ; Date: 06/07/2021 Time: 1:30 pm ; Judge: CIRCUIT, DIVISION 4 CRIMINAL Location: CJC Courtroom 3-A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketCRIMINAL COURT EVENT SET; Event: Arraignment ; Date: 05/03/2021 Time: 9:00 am ; Judge: CIRCUIT, DIVISION 4 CRIMINAL Location: CJC Courtroom 3-A; ; Result: EVENT CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • HearingDrug Court Hearing; Judge: GREEN, WALTER M; Result: HELD

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 03/23/2021
  • BondCharge Number: 1; Bond Type: SURETY BOND; Bond Amount: $1,000.00; Power Number: U521076048; Bond Status: Open; Bonding Company: ROUNDTREE BONDING AGENCY; Insurance Company: UNITED STATES FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketASSESSMENT - CF $50 INDIGENCE APPLICATION FEE; Amount: $50.00; Amount Due: $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ON REQUEST FOR APPOINTMENT OF PUBLIC DEFENDER AND DETERMINATION OF CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTANDING NO CONTACT ORDER PER AO 4.17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE CRIMINAL HISTORY; SUMMARY - SEE LAST PAGE OF FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketPROVISIONAL ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketARREST FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • FinancialTotal Fee Owed: $50.00; Total Fee Paid: $0.00; Total Fee Dismissed: $0.00; Total Fee Due: $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer PICKENS, KRISTIN S