Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Alachua County Courts on 04/16/2021 at 15:01:31 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA -VS- TERRELL, CALEB DANIEL

Case Summary

On 04/02/2021 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against TERRELL, CALEB DANIEL. This case was filed in Alachua County Courts, Alachua County Criminal Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DAVIS, WILLIAM E. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***************87 A

  • Filing Date:

    04/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Alachua County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alachua County Criminal Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Alachua, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DAVIS, WILLIAM E

 

Party Details

Defendant

TERRELL, CALEB DANIEL

Gainesville, FL 32608

Not Yet Classified

NAGEL, RYAN

Gainesville, FL 32601

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

KELLEY, AARON J

151 Sw 2Nd Ave

Gainesville, FL 32601

Not Yet Classified Attorney

NAGEL, RYAN

120 W University Ave

Gainesville, FL 32601

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF HEARING

04/14/2021: NOTICE OF HEARING

MOTION FOR BOND REDUCTION

04/14/2021: MOTION FOR BOND REDUCTION

EMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

04/09/2021: EMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

04/06/2021: NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY

04/06/2021: WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY

ORDER ON REQUEST FOR APPOINTMENT OF PUBLIC DEFENDER AND DETERMINATION OF CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS

04/03/2021: ORDER ON REQUEST FOR APPOINTMENT OF PUBLIC DEFENDER AND DETERMINATION OF CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS

ARREST FORM

04/03/2021: ARREST FORM

STANDING NO CONTACT ORDER PER AO 4.17

04/03/2021: STANDING NO CONTACT ORDER PER AO 4.17

FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

04/03/2021: FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/19/2021
  • HearingBond Hearing; Judge: DAVIS, WILLIAM E

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR BOND REDUCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketCRIMINAL COURT EVENT SET; Event: Bond Hearing ; Date: 04/19/2021 Time: 9:00 am ; Judge: CIRCUIT, DIVISION 4 CRIMINAL Location: CJC Courtroom 3-A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2021
  • DocketASSESSMENT - CF $50 INDIGENCE APPLICATION FEE; Amount: $50.00; Amount Due: $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ON REQUEST FOR APPOINTMENT OF PUBLIC DEFENDER AND DETERMINATION OF CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTANDING NO CONTACT ORDER PER AO 4.17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2021
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE CRIMINAL HISTORY; SUMMARY - SEE LAST PAGE OF FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2021
  • DocketPROVISIONAL ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketARREST FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • FinancialTotal Fee Owed: $50.00; Total Fee Paid: $0.00; Total Fee Dismissed: $0.00; Total Fee Due: $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer NAGEL, RYAN