Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Alachua County Courts on 02/11/2020 at 12:18:19 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA -VS- TALTON II, JOHN KADA

Case Summary

On 12/23/2017 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against TALTON II, JOHN KADA. This case was filed in Alachua County Courts, Alachua County Criminal Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DAVIS, WILLIAM E. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***************37 A

  • Filing Date:

    12/23/2017

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Alachua County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alachua County Criminal Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Alachua, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DAVIS, WILLIAM E

 

Party Details

Defendants

TALTON II, JOHN KADA

High Springs, FL 32643

TALTON, KADE J

High Springs, FL 32643

TALTON, JOHN KADE

High Springs, FL 32643

Not Yet Classified

PETERSON, MARC

Gainesville, FL 32602

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

TAT, SARA T

151 Sw 2Nd Ave

Gainesville, FL 32601

Not Yet Classified Attorney

PETERSON, MARC

120 W. University Ave

Gainesville, FL 32602

 

Court Documents

DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS COMMITMENT PACKET//CAT

10/19/2018: DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS COMMITMENT PACKET//CAT

ORDER OF REVOCATION OF PROBATION// MOSELEY

10/15/2018: ORDER OF REVOCATION OF PROBATION// MOSELEY

VICTIM NOTIFICATION DATA SHEET

10/15/2018: VICTIM NOTIFICATION DATA SHEET

FINGERPRINTS OF DEFENDANT

10/15/2018: FINGERPRINTS OF DEFENDANT

ENTERED A PLEA OF ADMISSION TO VIOLATION OF PROBATION

10/15/2018: ENTERED A PLEA OF ADMISSION TO VIOLATION OF PROBATION

NOTICE ISSUED TO ATTORNEY FOR DEFENDANT

09/26/2018: NOTICE ISSUED TO ATTORNEY FOR DEFENDANT

VOP Warrant Issued

09/11/2018: VOP Warrant Issued

MEMO FROM CLERKS OFFICE TO JUDICIAL ASSISTANT

03/22/2018: MEMO FROM CLERKS OFFICE TO JUDICIAL ASSISTANT

FINGERPRINTS OF DEFENDANT

03/13/2018: FINGERPRINTS OF DEFENDANT

COURT ACTION MEMO

03/13/2018: COURT ACTION MEMO

COURT ACTION MEMO

02/19/2018: COURT ACTION MEMO

STATE'S DISCOVERY EXHIBIT

02/15/2018: STATE'S DISCOVERY EXHIBIT

RESPONSE FROM JUDGE TO@

02/02/2018: RESPONSE FROM JUDGE TO@

LETTER FROM DEFENDANT TO JUDGE

02/02/2018: LETTER FROM DEFENDANT TO JUDGE

REQUEST FOR COPIES

01/10/2018: REQUEST FOR COPIES

FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

12/23/2017: FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

UNIFORM TRAFFIC CITATION FILED #A6UDHKE

12/23/2017: UNIFORM TRAFFIC CITATION FILED #A6UDHKE

UNIFORM TRAFFIC CITATION FILED #A6UDHLE

12/23/2017: UNIFORM TRAFFIC CITATION FILED #A6UDHLE

35 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/19/2019
  • DocketCASE (LIEN) FORWARDED TO COLLECTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2019
  • DocketCOLLECTIONS RECORD STAGED WITH LIEN AMOUNT OF $921.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURNED MAIL:RETURN TO SENDER; INSUFFICIENT ADDRESS; UNABLE TO FORWARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFIED COPY OF CIVIL JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS COMMITMENT PACKET//CAT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL JUDGMENT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2018
  • DocketAUDITED FOR CIVIL LIEN PURPOSES - $921.00 SENT TO JUDGE FOR SIGNATURE//JMC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • DocketOIEN BATCH RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • HearingArraignment for VOP; Judge: DAVIS, WILLIAM E; Result: HELD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • DocketPARTY CHARGE DISPOSITION ENTRY; Chg No: 3 Citation #: ; Degree of Offense: Third Degree Felony; Date of Offense Begin: 12/22/2017 End: ; Final Plea: Nolo Contendere 03/13/2018; Court Action: Guilty Adjudication 03/13/2018; Disp. Jdg: MOSELEY, MARK W; Division Nbr.: MM2 Jurisdiction Retained: ; Trial Type: None - No Trial; Date Imposed: 10/15/2018 Effective: 10/15/2018; Confinement Time: YYY 001 MM 00 DD 07; Defr. Sentence: No; Fines/Costs: Yes Fines: Costs: 671.00; Probation Time: YYY 003 MM 00 DD 00; Court Charge Status: Same; Court Action Code: 893.13(6)(A); Description: DRUGS-POSSESS: CNTRL SUB WO PRESCRIPTION; Degree of Offense: Third Degree Felony; Offense Activity: Not Applicable; Gen Off Character: Principal; Drug Type: Not Applicable; Miscellaneous Sentencing Option: PROBATION REVOKED; Miscellaneous Sentencing Option: RESENTENCING; Pty Chg Disp: 03/13/2018 Adjudicated Guilty/Delinquent in Juvenile Court; Pty Chg Disp: 02/15/2018 Filed; License Surrendered: No;

    Read MoreRead Less
70 More Docket Entries
  • 12/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2017
  • DocketDRIVING RECORD, DPPA-COMPLIANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2017
  • FinancialTotal Fee Owed: $921.00; Total Fee Paid: $0.00; Total Fee Dismissed: $0.00; Total Fee Due: $921.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2017
  • DocketPROVISIONAL ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2017
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE CRIMINAL HISTORY; SUMMARY - SEE LAST PAGE OF FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketARREST FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUNIFORM TRAFFIC CITATION FILED #A6UDHKE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUNIFORM TRAFFIC CITATION FILED #A6UDHLE

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer PETERSON, MARC