This case was last updated from Alachua County - Eighth Judicial Circuit Court on 02/05/2023 at 15:11:17 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA -VS- SUTTON, GANGA VARUNI

Case Summary

On 01/22/2023 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against SUTTON, GANGA VARUNI. This case was filed in Alachua County - Eighth Judicial Circuit Court, Alachua County Criminal Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***************65 A

  • Filing Date:

    01/22/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

 

Party Details

Defendant

SUTTON, GANGA VARUNI

Newberry, FL 32669

Not Yet Classified

RILEY, ANNA - LISA MYERS

Gainesville, FL 32602

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

YOCHIM SILVERMAN, KAREN

151 Sw 2Nd Avenue

Gainesville, FL 32601

Not Yet Classified Attorney

RILEY, ANNA - LISA MYERS

120 W University Ave

Gainesville, FL 32602

 

Court Documents

ARREST FORM

01/23/2023: ARREST FORM

FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

01/23/2023: FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

STANDING NO CONTACT ORDER PER AO 4.17

01/23/2023: STANDING NO CONTACT ORDER PER AO 4.17

NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

01/24/2023: NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

RECOGNIZANCE RELEASE TO SUPERVISION OF COURT SERVICES

01/24/2023: RECOGNIZANCE RELEASE TO SUPERVISION OF COURT SERVICES

AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENT STATUS (INDIGENT)

01/24/2023: AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENT STATUS (INDIGENT)

EMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

01/26/2023: EMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENT STATUS (INDIGENT)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • DocketASSESSMENT - MM $50 INDIGENCE APPLICATION FEE; Amount: $50.00; Amount Due: $50.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRECOGNIZANCE RELEASE TO SUPERVISION OF COURT SERVICES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISCOVERY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTANDING NO CONTACT ORDER PER AO 4.17

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE CRIMINAL HISTORY; SUMMARY - SEE LAST PAGE OF FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • DocketPROVISIONAL ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketARREST FORM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2023
  • FinancialTotal Fee Owed: $50.00; Total Fee Paid: $0.00; Total Fee Dismissed: $0.00; Total Fee Due: $50.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less