Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Alachua County Courts on 03/19/2020 at 08:41:34 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA -VS- SULLIVAN JR, MICHAEL PAUL

Case Summary

On 01/05/2020 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against SULLIVAN JR, MICHAEL PAUL. This case was filed in Alachua County Courts, Alachua County Criminal Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***************59 A

  • Filing Date:

    01/05/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Alachua County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alachua County Criminal Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Alachua, Florida

 

Party Details

Defendant

SULLIVAN JR, MICHAEL PAUL

Archer, FL 32618

Not Yet Classified

MARGULIES, DAVID

Gainesville, FL 32601

BRYANT, ANDRAE

Gainesville, FL 32609

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

KELLEY, AARON J

151 Sw 2Nd Ave

Gainesville, FL 32601

Not Yet Classified Attorney

MARGULIES, DAVID

120 W University Ave

Gainesville, FL 32601

 

Court Documents

EMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

01/09/2020: EMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY

01/08/2020: WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY

AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENT STATUS (INDIGENT)

01/07/2020: AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENT STATUS (INDIGENT)

SURETY BOND

01/07/2020: SURETY BOND

SURETY BOND

01/07/2020: SURETY BOND

SURETY BOND

01/07/2020: SURETY BOND

NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

01/06/2020: NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

01/05/2020: FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

UNIFORM TRAFFIC CITATION FILED #A7WISLE

01/05/2020: UNIFORM TRAFFIC CITATION FILED #A7WISLE

ARREST FORM

01/05/2020: ARREST FORM

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • DocketASSESSMENT - CF $50 INDIGENCE APPLICATION FEE; Amount: $50.00; Amount Due: $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENT STATUS (INDIGENT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSURETY BOND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • DocketARREST BOND ENTRY; ; Arrest Bond Added to Case with: ; Arrest Date: 01/05/2020 ; Initial Charge #: 3 ; Initial Action Code: ; Prosecutor Count #: ; Prosecutor Action Code: ; Custody Location: SURETY BOND ; Bond Status: Open ; Status Date: 01/06/2020 ; Bond Type: SURETY BOND ; Bond/Pwr No.: PSE5132602 ; Bond Amount: $5000 ; Bonding Co.: ANDRAE BRYANT BAIL BONDS ; Cash Depositor: ;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSURETY BOND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • DocketARREST BOND ENTRY; ; Arrest Bond Added to Case with: ; Arrest Date: 01/05/2020 ; Initial Charge #: 2 ; Initial Action Code: ; Prosecutor Count #: ; Prosecutor Action Code: ; Custody Location: SURETY BOND ; Bond Status: Open ; Status Date: 01/06/2020 ; Bond Type: SURETY BOND ; Bond/Pwr No.: PSE2520026 ; Bond Amount: $20000 ; Bonding Co.: ANDRAE BRYANT BAIL BONDS ; Cash Depositor: ;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSURETY BOND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • DocketARREST BOND ENTRY; ; Arrest Bond Added to Case with: ; Arrest Date: 01/05/2020 ; Initial Charge #: 1 ; Initial Action Code: ; Prosecutor Count #: ; Prosecutor Action Code: ; Custody Location: SURETY BOND ; Bond Status: Open ; Status Date: 01/06/2020 ; Bond Type: SURETY BOND ; Bond/Pwr No.: PSE2520027 ; Bond Amount: $20000 ; Bonding Co.: ANDRAE BRYANT BAIL BONDS ; Cash Depositor: ;

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 01/06/2020
  • BondCharge Number: 2; Bond Type: SURETY BOND; Bond Amount: $20,000.00; Power Number: PSE2520026; Bond Status: Open; Bonding Company: ANDRAE BRYANT BAIL BONDS; Insurance Company: PALMETTO SURETY CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • BondCharge Number: 1; Bond Type: SURETY BOND; Bond Amount: $20,000.00; Power Number: PSE2520027; Bond Status: Open; Bonding Company: ANDRAE BRYANT BAIL BONDS; Insurance Company: PALMETTO SURETY CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2020
  • FinancialTotal Fee Owed: $50.00; Total Fee Paid: $0.00; Total Fee Dismissed: $0.00; Total Fee Due: $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2020
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE CRIMINAL HISTORY; SUMMARY - SEE LAST PAGE OF FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2020
  • DocketPROVISIONAL ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2020
  • DocketDRIVING RECORD, DPPA-COMPLIANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUNIFORM TRAFFIC CITATION FILED #A7WISLE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketARREST FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer KELLEY, AARON J