Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Alachua County Courts on 02/03/2020 at 16:31:31 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA -VS- SUERO, KANDAS MARIE

Case Summary

On 03/10/2017 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against SUERO, KANDAS MARIE. This case was filed in Alachua County Courts, Alachua County Criminal Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is COLAW, JAMES M. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***************81 C

  • Filing Date:

    03/10/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Alachua County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alachua County Criminal Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Alachua, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

COLAW, JAMES M

 

Party Details

Defendants

SUERO, KANDAS MARIE

Gainesville, FL 32609

BUCKNER, KANDAS MARIE

Gainesville, FL 32609

SUERO, KANDIS

Gainesville, FL 32609

SUERO, CANDAS

Gainesville, FL 32609

Not Yet Classified

BECKER, MICHAEL L

Gainesville, FL 32601

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

TENNEY, JOHN W

151 Sw 2Nd Ave

Gainesville, FL 32601

Not Yet Classified Attorney

BECKER, MICHAEL L

Assistant State Attorney, 120 W University Ave

Gainesville, FL 32601

 

Court Documents

CASE ACTION REPORT: NOLLE/NO INFO FILED

11/15/2017: CASE ACTION REPORT: NOLLE/NO INFO FILED

DEFENDANT SIGNED NOTICE FOR CHANGE OF PLEA

10/05/2017: DEFENDANT SIGNED NOTICE FOR CHANGE OF PLEA

COURT ACTION MEMO

10/05/2017: COURT ACTION MEMO

DEFENDANT SIGNED NOTICE FOR CASE MANAGEMENT

09/06/2017: DEFENDANT SIGNED NOTICE FOR CASE MANAGEMENT

COURT ACTION MEMO

09/06/2017: COURT ACTION MEMO

STATE'S DISCOVERY EXHIBIT

07/25/2017: STATE'S DISCOVERY EXHIBIT

AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENT STATUS (INDIGENT)

07/19/2017: AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENT STATUS (INDIGENT)

NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

07/19/2017: NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

RECOGNIZANCE RELEASE TO SUPERVISION OF COURT SERVICES

07/19/2017: RECOGNIZANCE RELEASE TO SUPERVISION OF COURT SERVICES

NOTICE ISSUED TO ATTORNEY FOR DEFENDANT

07/18/2017: NOTICE ISSUED TO ATTORNEY FOR DEFENDANT

STANDING NO CONTACT ORDER PER AO 4.17

07/18/2017: STANDING NO CONTACT ORDER PER AO 4.17

FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

07/18/2017: FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

ARREST FORM

07/18/2017: ARREST FORM

Capias Issued (Do not delete)

07/11/2017: Capias Issued (Do not delete)

DEFENDANT INFORMATION SHEET

07/10/2017: DEFENDANT INFORMATION SHEET

PROSECUTOR VERIFICATION FORM

06/28/2017: PROSECUTOR VERIFICATION FORM

EMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

06/26/2017: EMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

SWORN COMPLAINT AFFIDAVIT

03/10/2017: SWORN COMPLAINT AFFIDAVIT

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/22/2017
  • HearingChange of Plea; Judge: COLAW, JAMES M; Result: EVENT CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2017
  • ChargeLARC: GRAND THEFT 300 LESS THAN 5K DOLS; Charge: 3; Phase: PROS; Disposition: NOLLE DEFENDANT PLED TO OTHER CHARGES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2017
  • ChargeFRAUD-SWINDLE: OBTAIN PROPERTY COMMUNICATION 300 D; Charge: 2; Phase: PROS; Disposition: NOLLE DEFENDANT PLED TO OTHER CHARGES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE ACTION REPORT: NOLLE/NO INFO FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2017
  • DocketOBTS PRE-COURT ENTRY; Count: 1, 2; PROSECUTOR PHASE; Final Decision Date: 11/15/2017; Final Action: 1J NOLLE DEFENDANT PLED TO OTHER CHARGES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2017
  • DocketCRIMINAL COURT EVENT SET; Event: Change of Plea ; Date: 11/22/2017 Time: 9:00 am ; Judge: CIRCUIT, DIVISION 2 CRIMINAL Location: CJC Courtroom 3-C; ; Result: EVENT CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANT SIGNED NOTICE FOR CHANGE OF PLEA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT ACTION MEMO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • HearingCase Management; Judge: COLAW, JAMES M; Result: HELD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWAIVER OF SPEEDY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
27 More Docket Entries
  • 06/22/2017
  • ChargePASS FORGED: ALTERED INSTRUMENT; Charge: 5; Phase: PROS; Disposition: NO ACTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2017
  • ChargeCOUNTERFEITING OF: PUBLIC RECORD CERTIFICATE ETC; Charge: 4; Phase: PROS; Disposition: NO ACTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2017
  • ChargeFRAUD-IMPERSON: MISREPRESENT SELF COMMIT PERSONAL; Charge: 1; Phase: PROS; Disposition: NO ACTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2017
  • DocketOBTS PRE-COURT ENTRY; Count: 1, 2; PROSECUTOR PHASE; Charge Status: Same; Filing Date: 06/22/2017; Final Decision Date: 06/22/2017; Final Action: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2017
  • DocketOBTS PRE-COURT ENTRY; Count: 3, 4, 5; PROSECUTOR PHASE; Charge Status: Same; Final Decision Date: 06/22/2017; Final Action: No Action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2017
  • Docket-012017CF1011A CONSOLIDATED INTO THIS CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINFORMATION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2017
  • FinancialTotal Fee Owed: $50.00; Total Fee Paid: $0.00; Total Fee Dismissed: $0.00; Total Fee Due: $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSWORN COMPLAINT AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BECKER MICHAEL L. LAW OFFICES OF