Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Alachua County Courts on 02/10/2020 at 02:10:00 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA -VS- STEPHENS, DANIEL HAYDEN

Case Summary

On 12/18/2017 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against STEPHENS, DANIEL HAYDEN. This case was filed in Alachua County Courts, Alachua County Criminal Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are GREEN, WALTER M, DAVIS, WILLIAM E and PENA, PHILLIP A. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***************77 A

  • Filing Date:

    12/18/2017

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Alachua County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alachua County Criminal Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Alachua, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

GREEN, WALTER M

DAVIS, WILLIAM E

PENA, PHILLIP A

 

Party Details

Defendant

STEPHENS, DANIEL HAYDEN

Archer, FL 32618

Not Yet Classified

PETERSON, MARC

Gainesville, FL 32602

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Goldman, Canaan

151 Sw 2Nd Ave

Gainesville, FL 32601

Not Yet Classified Attorney

PETERSON, MARC

120 W. University Ave

Gainesville, FL 32602

 

Court Documents

CIVIL JUDGMENT FILED

08/14/2018: CIVIL JUDGMENT FILED

ORDER ESTABLISHING MONETARY SUMS // MOSELEY

08/09/2018: ORDER ESTABLISHING MONETARY SUMS // MOSELEY

FELONY WITHHELD - JUDGMENT

08/09/2018: FELONY WITHHELD - JUDGMENT

ORDER PLACING DEFENDANT ON ADMINISTRATIVE PROBATION

08/09/2018: ORDER PLACING DEFENDANT ON ADMINISTRATIVE PROBATION

FINGERPRINTS OF DEFENDANT

08/09/2018: FINGERPRINTS OF DEFENDANT

ARREST FORM

07/17/2018: ARREST FORM

DRUG COURT NOTICE OF REINSTATEMENT OF PROSECUTION

05/21/2018: DRUG COURT NOTICE OF REINSTATEMENT OF PROSECUTION

DRUG COURT NOTICE OF REINSTATEMENT OF PROSECUTION

05/11/2018: DRUG COURT NOTICE OF REINSTATEMENT OF PROSECUTION

REPORT OF VIOLATION OF CONDITIONS OF DRUG COURT

05/11/2018: REPORT OF VIOLATION OF CONDITIONS OF DRUG COURT

RELEASED ON RECOGNIZANCE

04/11/2018: RELEASED ON RECOGNIZANCE

DEFENDANT SIGNED NOTICE FOR DRUG COURT

04/06/2018: DEFENDANT SIGNED NOTICE FOR DRUG COURT

DEFENDANT SIGNED NOTICE FOR DRUG COURT

03/09/2018: DEFENDANT SIGNED NOTICE FOR DRUG COURT

DRUG COURT NOTICE OF REFERRAL

01/30/2018: DRUG COURT NOTICE OF REFERRAL

ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE TO ADULT DRUG COURT//PENA

01/16/2018: ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE TO ADULT DRUG COURT//PENA

DEFENDANT SIGNED NOTICE FOR DRUG COURT

12/29/2017: DEFENDANT SIGNED NOTICE FOR DRUG COURT

DEFENDANT SIGNED NOTICE

12/22/2017: DEFENDANT SIGNED NOTICE

AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENT STATUS (INDIGENT)

12/19/2017: AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENT STATUS (INDIGENT)

ARREST FORM

12/18/2017: ARREST FORM

35 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/08/2019
  • DocketCASE (LIEN) FORWARDED TO COLLECTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • DocketCOLLECTIONS RECORD STAGED WITH LIEN AMOUNT OF $671.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFIED COPY OF CIVIL JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL JUDGMENT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • DocketAUDITED FOR CIVIL LIEN PURPOSES - $671.00 SENT TO JUDGE FOR SIGNATURE//JMC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2018
  • DocketOIEN BATCH RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • HearingCase Management; Judge: DAVIS, WILLIAM E; Result: HELD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • ChargeCOCAINE-POSSESS: POSSESS COCAINE; Charge: 1; Phase: COURT; Disposition: Withheld Adj.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION TO ENTER PLEA GUILTY OR NOLO//ACCEPTED// MOSELEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • DocketASSESSMENT - CF ATTORNEY FEES; Amount: $100.00; Amount Due: $100.00

    Read MoreRead Less
69 More Docket Entries
  • 12/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRELEASED ON RECOGNIZANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2017
  • FinancialTotal Fee Owed: $671.00; Total Fee Paid: $0.00; Total Fee Dismissed: $0.00; Total Fee Due: $671.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEMAIL TO ADD TO DRUG COURT DOCKET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2017
  • DocketCRIMINAL COURT EVENT SET; Event: Drug Court Hearing ; Date: 12/22/2017 Time: 10:00 am ; Judge: COUNTY, DIVISION 3 CRIMINAL Location: CJC Courtroom 1-B; ; Result: HELD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTANDING NO CONTACT ORDER PER AO 4.17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2017
  • DocketPROVISIONAL ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2017
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE CRIMINAL HISTORY; SUMMARY - SEE LAST PAGE OF FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketARREST FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Goldman, Canaan