This case was last updated from Alachua County Courts on 08/19/2021 at 02:32:30 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA -VS- SMITH JR, CHADRICK RODELL

Case Summary

On 04/11/2021 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against SMITH JR, CHADRICK RODELL. This case was filed in Alachua County Courts, Alachua County Criminal Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DAVIS, WILLIAM E. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***************95 A

  • Filing Date:

    04/11/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Courthouse:

    Alachua County Criminal Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Alachua, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DAVIS, WILLIAM E

 

Party Details

Defendants

SMITH JR, CHADRICK RODELL

Gainesville, FL 32641

SMITH, CHAD

Gainesville, FL 32641

SMITH, CHAD RODRELL

Gainesville, FL 32641

Not Yet Classified

ALACHUA, FELONY DIVISION III

Gainesville, FL 32601

RODGERS, ANGELA H

Gainesville, FL 32601

POISSON, MEREDITH

Gainesville, FL 32601

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

BULLOCK, ORAN LOTT

151 Sw 2Nd Ave

Gainesville, FL 32601

HUNT ESQ, DEBORAH

Regional Counsel, 235 S Main St Ste 205

Gainesville, FL 32601

Not Yet Classified Attorneys

ALACHUA, FELONY DIVISION III

120 W University Ave

Gainesville, FL 32601

RODGERS, ANGELA H

120 W University Ave

Gainesville, FL 32601

POISSON, MEREDITH

120 W University Ave

Gainesville, FL 32601

 

Court Documents

ATTORNEY SIGNED NOTICE

08/16/2021: ATTORNEY SIGNED NOTICE

COURT ACTION MEMO

08/16/2021: COURT ACTION MEMO

STATE'S DISCOVERY EXHIBIT

07/30/2021: STATE'S DISCOVERY EXHIBIT

NOTICE TO REGIONAL COUNSEL

07/06/2021: NOTICE TO REGIONAL COUNSEL

INFORMATION FILED

06/30/2021: INFORMATION FILED

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY AND DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY

06/22/2021: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY AND DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY

ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO WITHDRAW AND APPOINTING REGIONAL COUNSEL

06/21/2021: ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO WITHDRAW AND APPOINTING REGIONAL COUNSEL

CERTIFICATION OF CONFLICT OF INTEREST BETWEEN THE DEFENDANTS

06/17/2021: CERTIFICATION OF CONFLICT OF INTEREST BETWEEN THE DEFENDANTS

MOTION TO WITHDRAW

06/17/2021: MOTION TO WITHDRAW

EMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

05/04/2021: EMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

04/12/2021: NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

04/11/2021: FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

ARREST FORM

04/11/2021: ARREST FORM

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/04/2021
  • HearingCase Management; Judge: DAVIS, WILLIAM E

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • DocketCRIMINAL COURT EVENT SET; Event: Case Management ; Date: 10/04/2021 Time: 2:00 pm ; Judge: CIRCUIT, DIVISION 4 CRIMINAL Location: CJC Courtroom 3-A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • HearingCase Management; Judge: DAVIS, WILLIAM E; Result: HELD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketATTORNEY SIGNED NOTICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT ACTION MEMO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATE'S DISCOVERY EXHIBIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • HearingArraignment; Judge: DAVIS, WILLIAM E; Result: EVENT CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE TO REGIONAL COUNSEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • DocketCRIMINAL COURT EVENT SET; Event: Case Management ; Date: 08/16/2021 Time: 2:00 pm ; Judge: CIRCUIT, DIVISION 4 CRIMINAL Location: CJC Courtroom 3-A; ; Result: HELD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • DocketCRIMINAL COURT EVENT SET; Event: Arraignment ; Date: 07/12/2021 Time: 9:00 am ; Judge: CIRCUIT, DIVISION 4 CRIMINAL Location: CJC Courtroom 3-A; ; Result: EVENT CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 06/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE, WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY AND DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER GRANTING MOTION TO WITHDRAW AND APPOINTING REGIONAL COUNSEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATION OF CONFLICT OF INTEREST BETWEEN THE DEFENDANTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO WITHDRAW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2021
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE CRIMINAL HISTORY; SUMMARY - SEE LAST PAGE OF FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2021
  • DocketPROVISIONAL ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketARREST FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer RODGERS, ANGELA H