Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Alachua County Courts on 05/10/2021 at 16:04:16 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA -VS- SMITH, CALVIN DAVONTI

Case Summary

On 04/12/2021 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against SMITH, CALVIN DAVONTI. This case was filed in Alachua County Courts, Alachua County Criminal Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DAVIS, WILLIAM E. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***************05 A

  • Filing Date:

    04/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Alachua County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alachua County Criminal Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Alachua, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DAVIS, WILLIAM E

 

Party Details

Defendant

SMITH, CALVIN DAVONTI

High Springs, FL 32643

Not Yet Classified

RILEY, ANNA - LISA MYERS

Gainesville, FL 32602

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Goldman, Canaan

151 Sw 2Nd Ave

Gainesville, FL 32601

Not Yet Classified Attorney

RILEY, ANNA - LISA MYERS

120 W University Ave

Gainesville, FL 32602

 

Court Documents

RECOGNIZANCE RELEASE TO SUPERVISION OF COURT SERVICES

05/04/2021: RECOGNIZANCE RELEASE TO SUPERVISION OF COURT SERVICES

ORDER ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR RELEASE // DAVIS

05/03/2021: ORDER ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR RELEASE // DAVIS

COURT ACTION MEMO

05/03/2021: COURT ACTION MEMO

NOTICE OF HEARING

04/26/2021: NOTICE OF HEARING

NOTICE OF HEARING

04/26/2021: NOTICE OF HEARING

MOTION FOR RELEASE

04/26/2021: MOTION FOR RELEASE

MOTION FOR BOND REDUCTION

04/16/2021: MOTION FOR BOND REDUCTION

NOTICE OF HEARING

04/16/2021: NOTICE OF HEARING

WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY

04/15/2021: WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY

EMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

04/15/2021: EMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

04/13/2021: NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

ORDER APPOINTING THE PUBLIC DEFENDER

04/12/2021: ORDER APPOINTING THE PUBLIC DEFENDER

STANDING NO CONTACT ORDER PER AO 4.17

04/12/2021: STANDING NO CONTACT ORDER PER AO 4.17

FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

04/12/2021: FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

ARREST FORM

04/12/2021: ARREST FORM

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRECOGNIZANCE RELEASE TO SUPERVISION OF COURT SERVICES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • HearingBond Hearing; Judge: DAVIS, WILLIAM E; Result: HELD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR RELEASE // DAVIS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT ACTION MEMO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • DocketCRIMINAL COURT EVENT SET; Event: Bond Hearing ; Date: 05/03/2021 Time: 9:00 am ; Judge: CIRCUIT, DIVISION 4 CRIMINAL Location: CJC Courtroom 3-A; ; Result: HELD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR RELEASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR BOND REDUCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER APPOINTING THE PUBLIC DEFENDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTANDING NO CONTACT ORDER PER AO 4.17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE CRIMINAL HISTORY; SUMMARY - SEE LAST PAGE OF FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketPROVISIONAL ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketARREST FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer RILEY, ANNA - LISA MYERS