This case was last updated from Eighth Circuit Courts - Alachua County on 08/24/2021 at 10:33:29 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA -VS- SIMMONS, QUINTNELLIA KIERRA

Case Summary

On 06/22/2021 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against SIMMONS, QUINTNELLIA KIERRA. This case was filed in Eighth Circuit Courts - Alachua County, Alachua County Criminal Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is GREEN, WALTER M. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***************12 A

  • Filing Date:

    06/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Courthouse:

    Alachua County Criminal Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Alachua, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

GREEN, WALTER M

 

Party Details

Defendants

SIMMONS, QUINTNELLIA KIERRA

Gainesville, FL 32605

DL ID PER DAVID, S552711997280 EXP 2026

Gainesville, FL 32605

Not Yet Classified

RILEY, ANNA - LISA MYERS

Gainesville, FL 32602

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

RODRIGUEZ, LUIS D

151 Sw 2Nd Avenue

Gainesville, FL 32601

Not Yet Classified Attorney

RILEY, ANNA - LISA MYERS

120 W University Ave

Gainesville, FL 32602

 

Court Documents

INFORMATION FILED

08/10/2021: INFORMATION FILED

EMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

06/30/2021: EMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

RELEASED ON RECOGNIZANCE

06/24/2021: RELEASED ON RECOGNIZANCE

NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

06/23/2021: NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

ORDER ON REQUEST FOR APPOINTMENT OF PUBLIC DEFENDER AND DETERMINATION OF CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS

06/23/2021: ORDER ON REQUEST FOR APPOINTMENT OF PUBLIC DEFENDER AND DETERMINATION OF CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS

STANDING NO CONTACT ORDER PER AO 4.17

06/23/2021: STANDING NO CONTACT ORDER PER AO 4.17

FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

06/23/2021: FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

ARREST FORM

06/23/2021: ARREST FORM

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/06/2021
  • HearingArraignment; Judge: GREEN, WALTER M

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • DocketCRIMINAL COURT EVENT SET; Event: Arraignment ; Date: 10/06/2021 Time: 1:30 pm ; Judge: COUNTY, DIVISION 3 CRIMINAL Location: CJC Courtroom 1-A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • ChargeBATTERY: TOUCH OR STRIKE (DOMESTIC); Charge: 1; Phase: PROS; Disposition: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • DocketOBTS PRE-COURT ENTRY; Count: 1; PROSECUTOR PHASE; Charge Status: Same; Filing Date: 08/10/2021; Final Decision Date: 08/10/2021; Final Action: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINFORMATION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRELEASED ON RECOGNIZANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketASSESSMENT - MM $50 INDIGENCE APPLICATION FEE; Amount: $50.00; Amount Due: $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ON REQUEST FOR APPOINTMENT OF PUBLIC DEFENDER AND DETERMINATION OF CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTANDING NO CONTACT ORDER PER AO 4.17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE CRIMINAL HISTORY; SUMMARY - SEE LAST PAGE OF FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketPROVISIONAL ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketARREST FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • FinancialTotal Fee Owed: $50.00; Total Fee Paid: $0.00; Total Fee Dismissed: $0.00; Total Fee Due: $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer RILEY, ANNA - LISA MYERS