Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Alachua County Courts on 03/24/2021 at 16:09:35 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA -VS- SAULS, SEAN ELLIS

Case Summary

On 02/24/2021 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against SAULS, SEAN ELLIS. This case was filed in Alachua County Courts, Alachua County Criminal Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is PENA, PHILLIP A. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***************94 A

  • Filing Date:

    02/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Alachua County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alachua County Criminal Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Alachua, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

PENA, PHILLIP A

 

Party Details

Defendant

SAULS, SEAN ELLIS

Trenton, FL 32693

Not Yet Classified

ALACHUA, FELONY DIVISION IV

Gainesville, FL 32601

PICKENS, KRISTIN S

Gainesville, FL 32601

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

DEFENDER, PUBLIC

151 Sw 2Nd Ave

Gainesville, FL 32601

STACY, HOLLY R

151 Sw 2Nd Ave

Gainesville, FL 32601

Not Yet Classified Attorneys

ALACHUA, FELONY DIVISION IV

120 W University Ave

Gainesville, FL 32601

PICKENS, KRISTIN S

120 W University Ave

Gainesville, FL 32601

 

Court Documents

NOTICE ISSUED TO DEFENDANT

03/22/2021: NOTICE ISSUED TO DEFENDANT

COURT ACTION MEMO

03/18/2021: COURT ACTION MEMO

REPORT OF VIOLATION OF CONDITIONS OF VETERANS COURT - ISSUE CAPIAS // PENA

03/16/2021: REPORT OF VIOLATION OF CONDITIONS OF VETERANS COURT - ISSUE CAPIAS // PENA

REPORT OF VIOLATION OF CONDITIONS OF VETERANS COURT

03/15/2021: REPORT OF VIOLATION OF CONDITIONS OF VETERANS COURT

RETURNED MAIL:RETURN TO SENDER; ATTEMPTED-NOT KNOWN; UNABLE TO FORWARD

03/11/2021: RETURNED MAIL:RETURN TO SENDER; ATTEMPTED-NOT KNOWN; UNABLE TO FORWARD

NOTICE ISSUED TO DEFENDANT

03/05/2021: NOTICE ISSUED TO DEFENDANT

ORDER ON VIOLATION OF CONDITIONS OF VETERANS TREATMENT COURT AND ORDER FOR INPATIENT DUAL DIAGNOSIS TREATMENT//PENA

03/04/2021: ORDER ON VIOLATION OF CONDITIONS OF VETERANS TREATMENT COURT AND ORDER FOR INPATIENT DUAL DIAGNOSIS TREATMENT//PENA

REPORT OF VIOLATION OF CONDITIONS OF VETERANS COURT

03/04/2021: REPORT OF VIOLATION OF CONDITIONS OF VETERANS COURT

COURT ACTION MEMO

03/04/2021: COURT ACTION MEMO

REPORT OF VIOLATION OF CONDITIONS OF VETERANS COURT

03/04/2021: REPORT OF VIOLATION OF CONDITIONS OF VETERANS COURT

EMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

03/02/2021: EMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

NOTICE ISSUED TO ATTORNEY FOR DEFENDANT

02/26/2021: NOTICE ISSUED TO ATTORNEY FOR DEFENDANT

OUT OF COUNTY ORDER TRANSFER TO ALACHUA COUNTY; TRANSFERRED FROM 38-2019CF622A LEVY COUNTY

02/23/2021: OUT OF COUNTY ORDER TRANSFER TO ALACHUA COUNTY; TRANSFERRED FROM 38-2019CF622A LEVY COUNTY

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/08/2021
  • HearingVETERANS TREATMENT COURT; Judge: PENA, PHILLIP A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE ISSUED TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • HearingVETERANS TREATMENT COURT; Judge: PENA, PHILLIP A; Result: EVENT CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketCRIMINAL COURT EVENT SET; Event: VETERANS TREATMENT COURT ; Date: 04/08/2021 Time: 9:30 am ; Judge: PENA, PHILLIP A Location: CJC Courtroom 1-B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT ACTION MEMO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREPORT OF VIOLATION OF CONDITIONS OF VETERANS COURT - ISSUE CAPIAS // PENA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREPORT OF VIOLATION OF CONDITIONS OF VETERANS COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURNED MAIL:RETURN TO SENDER; ATTEMPTED-NOT KNOWN; UNABLE TO FORWARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE ISSUED TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • HearingVETERANS TREATMENT COURT; Judge: PENA, PHILLIP A; Result: HELD

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 03/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT ACTION MEMO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREPORT OF VIOLATION OF CONDITIONS OF VETERANS COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE ISSUED TO ATTORNEY FOR DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketCRIMINAL COURT EVENT SET; Event: VETERANS TREATMENT COURT ; Date: 03/04/2021 Time: 9:30 am ; Judge: PENA, PHILLIP A Location: CJC Courtroom 1-B; ; Result: HELD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • DocketOBTS POST-COURT ENTRY; Count: 1; POST SENTENCE PHASE; Date Reopened: 02/24/2021; Reason Reopened: In Veterans Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • DocketOBTS COURT ENTRY-VETERANS TREATMENT COURT CONVENANT AND AGREEMENT UNDER POST-PLEA PROGRAM FILED IN LEVY COUNTY; Count: 1; Charge Status: Same; Court Action: Pre-Trial Diversion 02/10/2021; Disp. Judge: DAVIS, WILLIAM E; Court Action: None - No Trial; Defr Sentence: No; Disp. Date: 02/10/2021; Pty Chrg Dsp: Pre-Trial Diversion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • DocketOBTS PRE-COURT ENTRY-INFORMATION FILED INT LEVY COUNTY ON 10012019; Count: 1; PROSECUTOR PHASE; Charge Status: Same; Filing Date: 10/01/2019; Final Decision Date: 10/01/2019; Final Action: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOUT OF COUNTY ORDER TRANSFER TO ALACHUA COUNTY; TRANSFERRED FROM 38-2019CF622A LEVY COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • ChargeAGGRAV BATTERY: PERSON USES A DEADLY WEAPON; Charge: 1; Phase: COURT; Disposition: Pre-Trial Diversion

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer STACY, HOLLY R