Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Alachua County Courts on 04/13/2021 at 16:03:46 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA -VS- SAMS, KEVIN MYRONIA

Case Summary

On 03/16/2021 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against SAMS, KEVIN MYRONIA. This case was filed in Alachua County Courts, Alachua County Criminal Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***************86 A

  • Filing Date:

    03/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Alachua County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alachua County Criminal Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Alachua, Florida

 

Party Details

Defendants

SAMS, KEVIN MYRONIA

Miami, FL 33142

DONALD, TERENCE ANTOINE

Miami, FL 33142

MCKAY, KIN

Miami, FL 33142

DOUND, TIM

Miami, FL 33142

WILLIAMS, KELVIN

Miami, FL 33142

SAMS, KEVIN

Miami, FL 33142

BRAWN, CRAIG

Miami, FL 33142

CRAIG

1420 Nw 60Th St

Miami, FL 33142

SAMS, KEVIN MICHAEL

Miami, FL 33142

SAMS, KELVIN

Miami, FL 33142

BROWN, KOJAK

Miami, FL 33142

THOMAS, JOHN

Miami, FL 33142

MCCAL, KEVIN M

Miami, FL 33142

Not Yet Classified

ROZAS, JOSEPH ANDREW

Gainesville, FL 32602

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

SCHMIDT, SCOTT T

151 Sw 2Nd Avenue

Gainesville, FL 32601

Not Yet Classified Attorney

ROZAS, JOSEPH ANDREW

120 W University Ave

Gainesville, FL 32602

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

03/22/2021: NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

EMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

03/19/2021: EMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

INFORMATION FILED

03/19/2021: INFORMATION FILED

UNIFORM TRAFFIC CITATION FILED #ADYOP3E (DUPLICATE)

03/18/2021: UNIFORM TRAFFIC CITATION FILED #ADYOP3E (DUPLICATE)

STATE'S DISCOVERY EXHIBIT

03/18/2021: STATE'S DISCOVERY EXHIBIT

RELEASED ON RECOGNIZANCE

03/17/2021: RELEASED ON RECOGNIZANCE

ORDER ON REQUEST FOR APPOINTMENT OF PUBLIC DEFENDER AND DETERMINATION OF CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS

03/16/2021: ORDER ON REQUEST FOR APPOINTMENT OF PUBLIC DEFENDER AND DETERMINATION OF CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS

FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

03/16/2021: FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

UNIFORM TRAFFIC CITATION FILED #ADYOP3E

03/16/2021: UNIFORM TRAFFIC CITATION FILED #ADYOP3E

ARREST FORM

03/16/2021: ARREST FORM

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketCase Transferred; New case: 2021 CT 000543 A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • ChargeDRIVE WHILE LIC SUSP HABITUAL OFFENDER; Charge: 1; Phase: PROS; Disposition: Transferred to Another Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINFORMATION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUNIFORM TRAFFIC CITATION FILED #ADYOP3E (DUPLICATE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATE'S DISCOVERY EXHIBIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRELEASED ON RECOGNIZANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • FinancialTotal Fee Owed: $50.00; Total Fee Paid: $0.00; Total Fee Dismissed: $50.00; Total Fee Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketASSESSMENT - CF $50 INDIGENCE APPLICATION FEE; Amount: $50.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ON REQUEST FOR APPOINTMENT OF PUBLIC DEFENDER AND DETERMINATION OF CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketDRIVING RECORD, DPPA-COMPLIANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE CRIMINAL HISTORY; SUMMARY - SEE LAST PAGE OF FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketPROVISIONAL ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUNIFORM TRAFFIC CITATION FILED #ADYOP3E

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketARREST FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Craig A Brown MD Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ROZAS, JOSEPH ANDREW