This case was last updated from Alachua County Courts on 08/18/2021 at 12:02:51 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA -VS- ROWE, ABIGAIL RUDINE

Case Summary

On 03/12/2021 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against ROWE, ABIGAIL RUDINE. This case was filed in Alachua County Courts, Alachua County Criminal Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***************53 A

  • Filing Date:

    03/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Courthouse:

    Alachua County Criminal Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Alachua, Florida

 

Party Details

Defendants

ROWE, ABIGAIL RUDINE

Gainesville, FL 32606

ROWE, ABIGAIL

Gainesville, FL 32606

ROWE, ABIGAIL RUDIWE

Gainesville, FL 32606

Not Yet Classified

ALACHUA, FELONY DIVISION III

Gainesville, FL 32601

ROZAS, JOSEPH ANDREW

Gainesville, FL 32602

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Yet Classified Attorneys

ALACHUA, FELONY DIVISION III

120 W University Ave

Gainesville, FL 32601

ROZAS, JOSEPH ANDREW

120 W University Ave

Gainesville, FL 32602

 

Court Documents

INFORMATION FILED

03/25/2021: INFORMATION FILED

EMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

03/18/2021: EMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

UNIFORM TRAFFIC CITATION FILED # AD3KANE (DUPLICATE)

03/15/2021: UNIFORM TRAFFIC CITATION FILED # AD3KANE (DUPLICATE)

UNIFORM TRAFFIC CITATION FILED # AD3KANE

03/12/2021: UNIFORM TRAFFIC CITATION FILED # AD3KANE

SWORN COMPLAINT AFFIDAVIT

03/12/2021: SWORN COMPLAINT AFFIDAVIT

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketCase Transferred; New case: 2021 CT 000609 A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • ChargeDRIVE WHILE LIC SUSP HABITUAL OFFENDER; Charge: 1; Phase: PROS; Disposition: Transferred to Another Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINFORMATION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • DocketDRIVING RECORD, DPPA-COMPLIANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUNIFORM TRAFFIC CITATION FILED # AD3KANE (DUPLICATE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUNIFORM TRAFFIC CITATION FILED # AD3KANE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSWORN COMPLAINT AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer ROZAS, JOSEPH ANDREW