Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Alachua County Courts on 06/19/2021 at 15:08:08 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA -VS- ROBINSON, MICHAEL TERRANCE

Case Summary

On 06/05/2021 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against ROBINSON, MICHAEL TERRANCE. This case was filed in Alachua County Courts, Alachua County Criminal Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is COLAW, JAMES M. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***************90 A

  • Filing Date:

    06/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Alachua County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alachua County Criminal Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Alachua, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

COLAW, JAMES M

 

Party Details

Defendant

ROBINSON, MICHAEL TERRANCE

Gainesville, FL 32606

Not Yet Classified

ALACHUA, FELONY CRIMES AGAINST

Gainesville, FL 32601

LEPIANKA, LUA JM

Gainesville, FL 32601

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

TENNEY, JOHN W

151 Sw 2Nd Ave

Gainesville, FL 32601

Not Yet Classified Attorneys

ALACHUA, FELONY CRIMES AGAINST

120 W University Ave

Gainesville, FL 32601

LEPIANKA, LUA JM

120 West University Ave

Gainesville, FL 32601

 

Court Documents

EMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

06/16/2021: EMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

RECOGNIZANCE RELEASE TO SUPERVISION OF COURT SERVICES

06/11/2021: RECOGNIZANCE RELEASE TO SUPERVISION OF COURT SERVICES

ORDER ON MOTION TO REDUCE BOND // COLAW

06/10/2021: ORDER ON MOTION TO REDUCE BOND // COLAW

COURT ACTION MEMO

06/10/2021: COURT ACTION MEMO

NOTICE OF HEARING

06/08/2021: NOTICE OF HEARING

MOTION FOR BOND REDUCTION

06/08/2021: MOTION FOR BOND REDUCTION

NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

06/07/2021: NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

STANDING NO CONTACT ORDER PER AO 4.17

06/06/2021: STANDING NO CONTACT ORDER PER AO 4.17

FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

06/06/2021: FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

ARREST FORM

06/06/2021: ARREST FORM

ORDER ON REQUEST FOR APPOINTMENT OF PUBLIC DEFENDER AND DETERMINATION OF CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS

06/06/2021: ORDER ON REQUEST FOR APPOINTMENT OF PUBLIC DEFENDER AND DETERMINATION OF CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRECOGNIZANCE RELEASE TO SUPERVISION OF COURT SERVICES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • HearingBond Hearing; Judge: COLAW, JAMES M; Result: HELD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ON MOTION TO REDUCE BOND // COLAW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT ACTION MEMO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR BOND REDUCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketCRIMINAL COURT EVENT SET; Event: Bond Hearing ; Date: 06/10/2021 Time: 1:30 pm ; Judge: CIRCUIT, DIVISION 3 CRIMINAL Location: CJC Courtroom 3-C; ; Result: HELD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTANDING NO CONTACT ORDER PER AO 4.17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2021
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE CRIMINAL HISTORY; SUMMARY - SEE LAST PAGE OF FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2021
  • DocketPROVISIONAL ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketARREST FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2021
  • DocketASSESSMENT - CF $50 INDIGENCE APPLICATION FEE; Amount: $50.00; Amount Due: $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ON REQUEST FOR APPOINTMENT OF PUBLIC DEFENDER AND DETERMINATION OF CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2021
  • FinancialTotal Fee Owed: $50.00; Total Fee Paid: $0.00; Total Fee Dismissed: $0.00; Total Fee Due: $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less