This case was last updated from Alachua County Courts on 08/18/2021 at 14:34:53 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA -VS- ROBINSON, DWAYNE JAVON

Case Summary

On 03/17/2021 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against ROBINSON, DWAYNE JAVON. This case was filed in Alachua County Courts, Alachua County Criminal Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is COLAW, JAMES M. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***************99 A

  • Filing Date:

    03/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Courthouse:

    Alachua County Criminal Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Alachua, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

COLAW, JAMES M

 

Party Details

Defendant

ROBINSON, DWAYNE JAVON

Gainesville, FL 32608

Not Yet Classified

ALACHUA, FELONY DIVISION III

Gainesville, FL 32601

BRYANT, ANDRAE

Gainesville, FL 32609

MARGULIES, DAVID

Gainesville, FL 32601

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Landsman, Matt D.

151 Sw 2Nd Ave

Gainesville, FL 32601

Not Yet Classified Attorneys

ALACHUA, FELONY DIVISION III

120 W University Ave

Gainesville, FL 32601

MARGULIES, DAVID

120 W University Ave

Gainesville, FL 32601

 

Court Documents

CERTIFICATE OF CANCELLATION

07/08/2021: CERTIFICATE OF CANCELLATION

SCORE SHEET

07/01/2021: SCORE SHEET

FINGERPRINTS OF DEFENDANT

07/01/2021: FINGERPRINTS OF DEFENDANT

ORDER OF COMMUNITY CONTROL AND PROBATION//COLAW

07/01/2021: ORDER OF COMMUNITY CONTROL AND PROBATION//COLAW

COURT ACTION MEMO

06/10/2021: COURT ACTION MEMO

STATE'S SUPPLEMENTAL DISCOVERY EXHIBIT

05/26/2021: STATE'S SUPPLEMENTAL DISCOVERY EXHIBIT

NOTICE ISSUED TO ATTORNEY FOR DEFENDANT

05/06/2021: NOTICE ISSUED TO ATTORNEY FOR DEFENDANT

STATE'S SUPPLEMENTAL DISCOVERY EXHIBIT

04/27/2021: STATE'S SUPPLEMENTAL DISCOVERY EXHIBIT

NOTICE ISSUED TO ATTORNEY FOR DEFENDANT

04/22/2021: NOTICE ISSUED TO ATTORNEY FOR DEFENDANT

CERTIFICATE OF CANCELLATION

04/20/2021: CERTIFICATE OF CANCELLATION

INFORMATION FILED

04/14/2021: INFORMATION FILED

EMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

03/31/2021: EMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

SURETY BOND

03/19/2021: SURETY BOND

SURETY BOND

03/19/2021: SURETY BOND

NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

03/18/2021: NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

03/18/2021: FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

ARREST FORM

03/18/2021: ARREST FORM

ORDER ON REQUEST FOR APPOINTMENT OF PUBLIC DEFENDER AND DETERMINATION OF CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS

03/18/2021: ORDER ON REQUEST FOR APPOINTMENT OF PUBLIC DEFENDER AND DETERMINATION OF CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/15/2021
  • DocketMONETARY OBLIGATIONS AUDITED//hap

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF CANCELLATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • BondCharge Number: 2; Bond Type: SURETY BOND; Bond Amount: $10,000.00; Power Number: PSE151550690; Bond Status: Released; Bonding Company: ANDRAE BRYANT BAIL BONDS; Insurance Company: PALMETTO SURETY CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • DocketASSESSMENT - CF ATTORNEY FEES; Amount: $100.00; Amount Due: $100.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • DocketASSESSMENT - CF STATE ATTY COST OF PROSECUTION; Amount: $100.00; Amount Due: $100.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • DocketASSESSMENT - $2 CF LCL LW ENFORCEMENT ; Charge #2: COCAINE-POSSESS: POSSESS COCAINE; Amount: $2.00; Amount Due: $2.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • DocketASSESSMENT - $419 CF BASE COSTS; Amount: $419.00; Amount Due: $419.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • DocketARREST BOND ENTRY; ; Ref: Bond/Pwr No.: PSE151550690 ; Initial Charge #: 2 ; Initial Action Code: COCAINE-POSSESS: POSSESS COCAINE ; Prosecutor Count #: 1 ; Prosecutor Action Code: COCAINE-POSSESS: POSSESS COCAINE ; Bonding Co.: ANDRAE BRYANT BAIL BONDS ; Bond Amount: $10000 ; The following field(s) on arrest bond 2 have been modified: ; New Bond Status Added: Released ; New Bond Status Date Added: 07/02/2021 ;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • HearingCase Management; Judge: COLAW, JAMES M; Result: HELD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • ChargeCOCAINE-POSSESS: POSSESS COCAINE; Charge: 1; Phase: COURT; Disposition: Guilty Adjudication

    Read MoreRead Less
36 More Docket Entries
  • 03/18/2021
  • BondCharge Number: 2; Bond Type: SURETY BOND; Bond Amount: $10,000.00; Power Number: PSE151550690; Bond Status: Open; Bonding Company: ANDRAE BRYANT BAIL BONDS; Insurance Company: PALMETTO SURETY CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • BondCharge Number: 1; Bond Type: SURETY BOND; Bond Amount: $2,500.00; Power Number: PSE5920697; Bond Status: Open; Bonding Company: ANDRAE BRYANT BAIL BONDS; Insurance Company: PALMETTO SURETY CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE CRIMINAL HISTORY; SUMMARY - SEE LAST PAGE OF FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketPROVISIONAL ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketARREST FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketASSESSMENT - CF $50 INDIGENCE APPLICATION FEE; Amount: $50.00; Amount Due: $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ON REQUEST FOR APPOINTMENT OF PUBLIC DEFENDER AND DETERMINATION OF CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • FinancialTotal Fee Owed: $671.00; Total Fee Paid: $0.00; Total Fee Dismissed: $0.00; Total Fee Due: $671.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MARGULIES, DAVID