This case was last updated from Alachua County Courts on 08/19/2021 at 02:31:29 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA -VS- ROBINSON, BOBBY JOE

Case Summary

On 04/11/2021 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against ROBINSON, BOBBY JOE. This case was filed in Alachua County Courts, Alachua County Criminal Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is COLAW, JAMES M. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***************82 A

  • Filing Date:

    04/11/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Courthouse:

    Alachua County Criminal Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Alachua, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

COLAW, JAMES M

 

Party Details

Defendant

ROBINSON, BOBBY JOE

Bell, FL 32619

Not Yet Classified

ALACHUA, FELONY DRUG DIVISION

Gainesville, FL 32601

ALACHUA, FELONY DIVISION III

Gainesville, FL 32601

HECHAVARRIA, OMAR

Gainesville, FL 32601

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

LIMOGE, VALERIE L

151 Sw 2Nd Ave

Gainesville, FL 32601

Not Yet Classified Attorneys

ALACHUA, FELONY DRUG DIVISION

120 W University Ave

Gainesville, FL 32601

ALACHUA, FELONY DIVISION III

120 W University Ave

Gainesville, FL 32601

HECHAVARRIA, OMAR

120 W. University Ave

Gainesville, FL 32601

 

Court Documents

CERTIFIED COPY OF CIVIL JUDGMENT

05/18/2021: CERTIFIED COPY OF CIVIL JUDGMENT

CIVIL JUDGMENT ENTERED

05/17/2021: CIVIL JUDGMENT ENTERED

DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS COMMITMENT PACKET

05/12/2021: DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS COMMITMENT PACKET

FINGERPRINTS OF DEFENDANT

05/07/2021: FINGERPRINTS OF DEFENDANT

VICTIM NOTIFICATION DATA SHEET

05/06/2021: VICTIM NOTIFICATION DATA SHEET

RESTITUTION ORDER - NOT APPLICABLE//@

05/06/2021: RESTITUTION ORDER - NOT APPLICABLE//@

ORDER ESTABLISHING MONETARY SUMS

05/06/2021: ORDER ESTABLISHING MONETARY SUMS

FELONY GUILTY - JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE

05/06/2021: FELONY GUILTY - JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE

SCORE SHEET

05/06/2021: SCORE SHEET

COURT ACTION MEMO

05/06/2021: COURT ACTION MEMO

STATE'S DISCOVERY EXHIBIT

05/05/2021: STATE'S DISCOVERY EXHIBIT

NOTICE ISSUED TO ATTORNEY FOR DEFENDANT

04/22/2021: NOTICE ISSUED TO ATTORNEY FOR DEFENDANT

EMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

04/15/2021: EMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

INFORMATION FILED

04/14/2021: INFORMATION FILED

NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

04/12/2021: NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

04/11/2021: FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

ARREST FORM

04/11/2021: ARREST FORM

ORDER ON REQUEST FOR APPOINTMENT OF PUBLIC DEFENDER AND DETERMINATION OF CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS

04/11/2021: ORDER ON REQUEST FOR APPOINTMENT OF PUBLIC DEFENDER AND DETERMINATION OF CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/21/2021
  • DocketMONETARY OBLIGATIONS AUDITED//hap

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFIED COPY OF CIVIL JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL JUDGMENT ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • DocketCASE AUDITED FOR CIVIL LIEN PURPOSES - $671.00 LIEN SENT TO JUDGE FOR SIGNATURE//HAP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS COMMITMENT PACKET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFINGERPRINTS OF DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • DocketOIEN BATCH RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • HearingArraignment; Judge: COLAW, JAMES M; Result: HELD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • ChargeDRUG EQUIP-POSSESS: AND OR USE; Charge: 2; Phase: PROS; Disposition: NOLLE PROSEQUI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • ChargeDRUGS-POSSESS: CNTRL SUB WO PRESCRIPTION; Charge: 1; Phase: COURT; Disposition: Guilty Adjudication

    Read MoreRead Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketOBTS PRE-COURT ENTRY; Count: 1, 2; PROSECUTOR PHASE; Charge Status: Same; Filing Date: 04/14/2021; Final Decision Date: 04/14/2021; Final Action: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINFORMATION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2021
  • FinancialTotal Fee Owed: $671.00; Total Fee Paid: $0.00; Total Fee Dismissed: $0.00; Total Fee Due: $671.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2021
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE CRIMINAL HISTORY; SUMMARY - SEE LAST PAGE OF FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2021
  • DocketPROVISIONAL ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketARREST FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2021
  • DocketASSESSMENT - CF $50 INDIGENCE APPLICATION FEE; Amount: $50.00; Amount Due: $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ON REQUEST FOR APPOINTMENT OF PUBLIC DEFENDER AND DETERMINATION OF CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer LIMOGE, VALERIE L