Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Alachua County Courts on 06/25/2021 at 17:10:30 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA -VS- ROBINSON, ANTONIO TAMAR

Case Summary

On 05/27/2021 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against ROBINSON, ANTONIO TAMAR. This case was filed in Alachua County Courts, Alachua County Criminal Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is COLAW, JAMES M. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***************80 A

  • Filing Date:

    05/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Alachua County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alachua County Criminal Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Alachua, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

COLAW, JAMES M

 

Party Details

Defendant

ROBINSON, ANTONIO TAMAR

Gainesville, FL 32609

Not Yet Classified

LEPIANKA, LUA JM

Gainesville, FL 32601

PERTEE, ANDRE

Gainesville, FL 32609

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

TENNEY, JOHN W

151 Sw 2Nd Ave

Gainesville, FL 32601

Not Yet Classified Attorney

LEPIANKA, LUA JM

120 West University Ave

Gainesville, FL 32601

 

Court Documents

SURETY BOND

06/14/2021: SURETY BOND

ORDER ON MOTION TO REUCE BOND // COLAW

06/10/2021: ORDER ON MOTION TO REUCE BOND // COLAW

COURT ACTION MEMO

06/10/2021: COURT ACTION MEMO

NOTICE OF HEARING

06/03/2021: NOTICE OF HEARING

MOTION FOR BOND REDUCTION

06/03/2021: MOTION FOR BOND REDUCTION

NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

06/03/2021: NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

EMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

06/01/2021: EMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

STANDING NO CONTACT ORDER PER AO 4.17

05/27/2021: STANDING NO CONTACT ORDER PER AO 4.17

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/14/2021
  • DocketARREST BOND ENTRY; ; Arrest Bond Added to Case with: ; Arrest Date: 05/26/2021 ; Initial Charge #: 1 ; Initial Action Code: ; Prosecutor Count #: ; Prosecutor Action Code: ; Custody Location: SURETY BOND ; Bond Status: Open ; Status Date: 06/13/2021 ; Bond Type: SURETY BOND ; Bond/Pwr No.: PSE50932804 ; Bond Amount: $50000 ; Bonding Co.: ANDRAE BRYANT BAIL BONDS ; Cash Depositor: ;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSURETY BOND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2021
  • BondCharge Number: 1; Bond Type: SURETY BOND; Bond Amount: $50,000.00; Power Number: PSE50932804; Bond Status: Open; Bonding Company: ANDRAE BRYANT BAIL BONDS; Insurance Company: PALMETTO SURETY CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • HearingBond Hearing; Judge: COLAW, JAMES M; Result: HELD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ON MOTION TO REUCE BOND // COLAW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT ACTION MEMO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • DocketCRIMINAL COURT EVENT SET; Event: Bond Hearing ; Date: 06/10/2021 Time: 1:30 pm ; Judge: CIRCUIT, DIVISION 3 CRIMINAL Location: CJC Courtroom 3-C; ; Result: HELD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR BOND REDUCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTANDING NO CONTACT ORDER PER AO 4.17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE CRIMINAL HISTORY; SUMMARY - SEE LAST PAGE OF FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • DocketPROVISIONAL ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • DocketARREST FORM

    Read MoreRead Less