Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Alachua County Courts on 05/10/2021 at 16:03:36 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA -VS- ROBERTS JR, JERRY JEROME

Case Summary

On 04/12/2021 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against ROBERTS JR, JERRY JEROME. This case was filed in Alachua County Courts, Alachua County Criminal Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is COLAW, JAMES M. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***************06 A

  • Filing Date:

    04/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Alachua County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alachua County Criminal Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Alachua, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

COLAW, JAMES M

 

Party Details

Defendant

ROBERTS JR, JERRY JEROME

Gainesville, FL 32608

Not Yet Classified

ALACHUA, FELONY CRIMES AGAINST

Gainesville, FL 32601

LEPIANKA, LUA JM

Gainesville, FL 32601

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

TENNEY, JOHN W

151 Sw 2Nd Ave

Gainesville, FL 32601

Not Yet Classified Attorneys

ALACHUA, FELONY CRIMES AGAINST

120 W University Ave

Gainesville, FL 32601

LEPIANKA, LUA JM

120 West University Ave

Gainesville, FL 32601

 

Court Documents

STATE'S DISCOVERY EXHIBIT

05/10/2021: STATE'S DISCOVERY EXHIBIT

DEMAND FOR NOTICE OF INTENTION TO CLAIM ALIBI

05/10/2021: DEMAND FOR NOTICE OF INTENTION TO CLAIM ALIBI

ORDER DENYING MOTION TO REDUCE BOND

04/29/2021: ORDER DENYING MOTION TO REDUCE BOND

COURT ACTION MEMO

04/29/2021: COURT ACTION MEMO

NOTICE ISSUED TO ATTORNEY FOR DEFENDANT

04/27/2021: NOTICE ISSUED TO ATTORNEY FOR DEFENDANT

INFORMATION FILED

04/26/2021: INFORMATION FILED

EMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

04/21/2021: EMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

NOTICE OF HEARING

04/20/2021: NOTICE OF HEARING

NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

04/15/2021: NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

04/13/2021: FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

ARREST FORM

04/13/2021: ARREST FORM

ORDER ON REQUEST FOR APPOINTMENT OF PUBLIC DEFENDER AND DETERMINATION OF CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS

04/13/2021: ORDER ON REQUEST FOR APPOINTMENT OF PUBLIC DEFENDER AND DETERMINATION OF CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/13/2021
  • HearingArraignment; Judge: COLAW, JAMES M

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATE'S DISCOVERY EXHIBIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR NOTICE OF INTENTION TO CLAIM ALIBI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • HearingBond Hearing; Judge: COLAW, JAMES M; Result: HELD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER DENYING MOTION TO REDUCE BOND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT ACTION MEMO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE ISSUED TO ATTORNEY FOR DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketCRIMINAL COURT EVENT SET; Event: Arraignment ; Date: 05/13/2021 Time: 9:00 am ; Judge: CIRCUIT, DIVISION 3 CRIMINAL Location: CJC Courtroom 3-C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • ChargeSMUGGLE CONTRABAND: CTRL SUB DEFINED IN s.893.02(4; Charge: 1; Phase: PROS; Disposition: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • DocketOBTS PRE-COURT ENTRY; Count: 1; PROSECUTOR PHASE; Charge Status: Same; Filing Date: 04/26/2021; Final Decision Date: 04/26/2021; Final Action: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 04/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • DocketCRIMINAL COURT EVENT SET; Event: Bond Hearing ; Date: 04/29/2021 Time: 1:30 pm ; Judge: CIRCUIT, DIVISION 3 CRIMINAL Location: CJC Courtroom 2-C; ; Result: HELD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE CRIMINAL HISTORY; SUMMARY - SEE LAST PAGE OF FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketPROVISIONAL ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketARREST FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketASSESSMENT - CF $50 INDIGENCE APPLICATION FEE; Amount: $50.00; Amount Due: $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ON REQUEST FOR APPOINTMENT OF PUBLIC DEFENDER AND DETERMINATION OF CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • FinancialTotal Fee Owed: $50.00; Total Fee Paid: $0.00; Total Fee Dismissed: $0.00; Total Fee Due: $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer TENNEY, JOHN W