Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Alachua County Courts on 03/25/2021 at 16:30:11 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA -VS- ROBERSON, JOHN KENNETH

Case Summary

On 02/25/2021 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against ROBERSON, JOHN KENNETH. This case was filed in Alachua County Courts, Alachua County Criminal Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***************07 A

  • Filing Date:

    02/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Alachua County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alachua County Criminal Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Alachua, Florida

 

Party Details

Defendants

ROBERSON, JOHN KENNETH

Gainesville, FL 32653

HUFF, BRIAN JOHN

Gainesville, FL 32653

Not Yet Classified

ALACHUA, FELONY DIVISION III

Gainesville, FL 32601

MARGULIES, DAVID

Gainesville, FL 32601

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

LIMOGE, VALERIE L

151 Sw 2Nd Ave

Gainesville, FL 32601

Not Yet Classified Attorneys

ALACHUA, FELONY DIVISION III

120 W University Ave

Gainesville, FL 32601

MARGULIES, DAVID

120 W University Ave

Gainesville, FL 32601

 

Court Documents

INFORMATION FILED

03/24/2021: INFORMATION FILED

STATE'S DISCOVERY EXHIBIT

03/24/2021: STATE'S DISCOVERY EXHIBIT

INDIGENCE APPLICATION FORM - DUPLICATE OR NOT FILED TIMELY

03/17/2021: INDIGENCE APPLICATION FORM - DUPLICATE OR NOT FILED TIMELY

EMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

03/03/2021: EMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

03/01/2021: NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

ARREST FORM

02/26/2021: ARREST FORM

STANDING NO CONTACT ORDER PER AO 4.17

02/26/2021: STANDING NO CONTACT ORDER PER AO 4.17

FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

02/26/2021: FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

ORDER ON REQUEST FOR APPOINTMENT OF PUBLIC DEFENDER AND DETERMINATION OF CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS

02/26/2021: ORDER ON REQUEST FOR APPOINTMENT OF PUBLIC DEFENDER AND DETERMINATION OF CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINFORMATION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATE'S DISCOVERY EXHIBIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINDIGENCE APPLICATION FORM - DUPLICATE OR NOT FILED TIMELY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTANDING NO CONTACT ORDER PER AO 4.17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE CRIMINAL HISTORY; SUMMARY - SEE LAST PAGE OF FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketPROVISIONAL ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketARREST FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketASSESSMENT - CF $50 INDIGENCE APPLICATION FEE; Amount: $50.00; Amount Due: $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ON REQUEST FOR APPOINTMENT OF PUBLIC DEFENDER AND DETERMINATION OF CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • FinancialTotal Fee Owed: $50.00; Total Fee Paid: $0.00; Total Fee Dismissed: $0.00; Total Fee Due: $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MARGULIES, DAVID