This case was last updated from Alachua County Courts on 08/24/2021 at 10:35:00 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA -VS- ROBB, BLAKE ERINN

Case Summary

On 06/22/2021 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against ROBB, BLAKE ERINN. This case was filed in Alachua County Courts, Alachua County Criminal Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***************92 A

  • Filing Date:

    06/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Alachua, Florida

 

Party Details

Defendant

ROBB, BLAKE ERINN

Gainesville, FL 32609

Not Yet Classified

LEPIANKA, LUA JM

Gainesville, FL 32601

RODGERS, ANGELA H

Gainesville, FL 32601

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

LIMOGE, VALERIE L

151 Sw 2Nd Ave

Gainesville, FL 32601

Not Yet Classified Attorneys

LEPIANKA, LUA JM

120 West University Ave

Gainesville, FL 32601

RODGERS, ANGELA H

120 W University Ave

Gainesville, FL 32601

 

Court Documents

EMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

06/28/2021: EMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

06/23/2021: NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

ORDER ON REQUEST FOR APPOINTMENT OF PUBLIC DEFENDER AND DETERMINATION OF CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS

06/23/2021: ORDER ON REQUEST FOR APPOINTMENT OF PUBLIC DEFENDER AND DETERMINATION OF CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS

STANDING NO CONTACT ORDER PER AO 4.17

06/23/2021: STANDING NO CONTACT ORDER PER AO 4.17

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketINFORMATION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • DocketLETTER FROM DEFENDANT TO CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketASSESSMENT - CF $50 INDIGENCE APPLICATION FEE; Amount: $50.00; Amount Due: $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ON REQUEST FOR APPOINTMENT OF PUBLIC DEFENDER AND DETERMINATION OF CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTANDING NO CONTACT ORDER PER AO 4.17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE CRIMINAL HISTORY; SUMMARY - SEE LAST PAGE OF FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketPROVISIONAL ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketARREST FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • FinancialTotal Fee Owed: $50.00; Total Fee Paid: $0.00; Total Fee Dismissed: $0.00; Total Fee Due: $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer RODGERS, ANGELA H