This case was last updated from Alachua County Courts on 08/18/2021 at 22:17:41 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA -VS- RICHARDSON, TRENASHIA LASHAWN

Case Summary

On 04/03/2021 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against RICHARDSON, TRENASHIA LASHAWN. This case was filed in Alachua County Courts, Alachua County Criminal Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is COLAW, JAMES M. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***************02 A

  • Filing Date:

    04/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Courthouse:

    Alachua County Criminal Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Alachua, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

COLAW, JAMES M

 

Party Details

Defendant

RICHARDSON, TRENASHIA LASHAWN

Gainesville, FL 32608

Not Yet Classified

ALACHUA, FELONY DIVISION III

Gainesville, FL 32601

MCCAIN, ANDREW

Gainesville, FL 32601

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

McGill, Francis Andrew

151 Sw 2Nd Ave

Gainesville, FL 32601

SALMON, BILL

410 Se 4Th Ave

Gainesville, FL 32601

Not Yet Classified Attorneys

ALACHUA, FELONY DIVISION III

120 W University Ave

Gainesville, FL 32601

MCCAIN, ANDREW

120 W University Ave

Gainesville, FL 32601

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF HEARING

05/07/2021: NOTICE OF HEARING

MOTION FOR BOND REDUCTION

05/03/2021: MOTION FOR BOND REDUCTION

EMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

04/09/2021: EMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO WITHDRAW & APPOINTING CONFLICT ATTORNEY

04/08/2021: ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO WITHDRAW & APPOINTING CONFLICT ATTORNEY

CERTIFICATION OF CONFLICT OF INTEREST BETWEEN THE DEFENDANTS

04/08/2021: CERTIFICATION OF CONFLICT OF INTEREST BETWEEN THE DEFENDANTS

MOTION TO WITHDRAW

04/08/2021: MOTION TO WITHDRAW

ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO WITHDRAW AND APPOINTING REGIONAL COUNSEL

04/07/2021: ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO WITHDRAW AND APPOINTING REGIONAL COUNSEL

CERTIFICATION OF CONFLICT OF INTEREST BETWEEN THE DEFENDANTS

04/06/2021: CERTIFICATION OF CONFLICT OF INTEREST BETWEEN THE DEFENDANTS

MOTION TO WITHDRAW

04/06/2021: MOTION TO WITHDRAW

NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

04/05/2021: NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

ORDER ON REQUEST FOR APPOINTMENT OF PUBLIC DEFENDER AND DETERMINATION OF CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS

04/03/2021: ORDER ON REQUEST FOR APPOINTMENT OF PUBLIC DEFENDER AND DETERMINATION OF CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS

FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

04/03/2021: FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

ARREST FORM

04/03/2021: ARREST FORM

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/13/2021
  • HearingBond Hearing; Judge: COLAW, JAMES M; Result: EVENT CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • ChargePETIT THEFT 2ND DEGREE 1ST OFFENSE; Charge: 2; Phase: PROS; Disposition: Consolidated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • ChargeBURGL: UNOCCUPIED CONVEYANCE UNARMED; Charge: 1; Phase: PROS; Disposition: Consolidated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • Docket-CONSOLIDATED INTO 012021CF870B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • DocketOBTS PRE-COURT ENTRY; Count: 1, 2; PROSECUTOR PHASE; Charge Status: Same; Final Decision Date: 05/07/2021; Final Action: Consol Crim

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • DocketCRIMINAL COURT EVENT SET; Event: Bond Hearing ; Date: 05/13/2021 Time: 1:30 pm ; Judge: CIRCUIT, DIVISION 3 CRIMINAL Location: CJC Courtroom 2-C; ; Result: EVENT CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR BOND REDUCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER GRANTING MOTION TO WITHDRAW & APPOINTING CONFLICT ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 04/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER GRANTING MOTION TO WITHDRAW AND APPOINTING REGIONAL COUNSEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATION OF CONFLICT OF INTEREST BETWEEN THE DEFENDANTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO WITHDRAW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2021
  • FinancialTotal Fee Owed: $50.00; Total Fee Paid: $0.00; Total Fee Dismissed: $50.00; Total Fee Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2021
  • DocketASSESSMENT - CF $50 INDIGENCE APPLICATION FEE; Amount: $50.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ON REQUEST FOR APPOINTMENT OF PUBLIC DEFENDER AND DETERMINATION OF CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2021
  • DocketPROVISIONAL ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketARREST FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MCCAIN, ANDREW