Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Alachua County Courts on 04/29/2021 at 16:02:16 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA -VS- RICHARDSON, MATTHEW MARTIN

Case Summary

On 04/01/2021 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against RICHARDSON, MATTHEW MARTIN. This case was filed in Alachua County Courts, Alachua County Criminal Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***************77 A

  • Filing Date:

    04/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Alachua County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alachua County Criminal Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Alachua, Florida

 

Party Details

Defendant

RICHARDSON, MATTHEW MARTIN

Hernando, FL 34442

Not Yet Classified

ALACHUA, FELONY DIVISION III

Gainesville, FL 32601

MARGULIES, DAVID

Gainesville, FL 32601

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

DEFENDER, PUBLIC

151 Sw 2Nd Ave

Gainesville, FL 32601

LIMOGE, VALERIE L

151 Sw 2Nd Ave

Gainesville, FL 32601

Not Yet Classified Attorneys

ALACHUA, FELONY DIVISION III

120 W University Ave

Gainesville, FL 32601

MARGULIES, DAVID

120 W University Ave

Gainesville, FL 32601

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY AND DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY

04/21/2021: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY AND DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY

EMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

04/15/2021: EMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

04/05/2021: NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

ARREST FORM

04/02/2021: ARREST FORM

ORDER ON REQUEST FOR APPOINTMENT OF PUBLIC DEFENDER AND DETERMINATION OF CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS

04/02/2021: ORDER ON REQUEST FOR APPOINTMENT OF PUBLIC DEFENDER AND DETERMINATION OF CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS

FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

04/02/2021: FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

UNIFORM TRAFFIC CITATION FILED #ADYPTVE

04/02/2021: UNIFORM TRAFFIC CITATION FILED #ADYPTVE

UNIFORM TRAFFIC CITATION FILED #ADYPTUE

04/02/2021: UNIFORM TRAFFIC CITATION FILED #ADYPTUE

UNIFORM TRAFFIC CITATION FILED #ADYPTTE

04/02/2021: UNIFORM TRAFFIC CITATION FILED #ADYPTTE

UNIFORM TRAFFIC CITATION FILED #ADYPTXE

04/02/2021: UNIFORM TRAFFIC CITATION FILED #ADYPTXE

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE, WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY AND DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • DocketASSESSMENT - CF $50 INDIGENCE APPLICATION FEE; Amount: $50.00; Amount Due: $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ON REQUEST FOR APPOINTMENT OF PUBLIC DEFENDER AND DETERMINATION OF CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • DocketDRIVING RECORD, DPPA-COMPLIANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE CRIMINAL HISTORY; SUMMARY - SEE LAST PAGE OF FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • DocketPROVISIONAL ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUNIFORM TRAFFIC CITATION FILED #ADYPTVE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUNIFORM TRAFFIC CITATION FILED #ADYPTUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUNIFORM TRAFFIC CITATION FILED #ADYPTTE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUNIFORM TRAFFIC CITATION FILED #ADYPTXE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketARREST FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • FinancialTotal Fee Owed: $50.00; Total Fee Paid: $0.00; Total Fee Dismissed: $0.00; Total Fee Due: $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MARGULIES, DAVID