Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Alachua County Courts on 05/10/2021 at 16:01:25 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA -VS- RIBOT JR, BRIAN ANGELO

Case Summary

On 04/12/2021 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against RIBOT JR, BRIAN ANGELO. This case was filed in Alachua County Courts, Alachua County Criminal Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***************02 A

  • Filing Date:

    04/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Alachua County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alachua County Criminal Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Alachua, Florida

 

Party Details

Defendant

RIBOT JR, BRIAN ANGELO

Fort White, FL 32038

Not Yet Classified

BRYANT, ANDRAE

Gainesville, FL 32609

OWEN, DANIEL R

Gainesville, FL 32601

ALACHUA, FELONY DIVISION III

Gainesville, FL 32601

WATSON, VICTORIA A

Gainesville, FL 32601

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

LIMOGE, VALERIE L

151 Sw 2Nd Ave

Gainesville, FL 32601

Not Yet Classified Attorneys

OWEN, DANIEL R

120 W University Ave

Gainesville, FL 32601

ALACHUA, FELONY DIVISION III

120 W University Ave

Gainesville, FL 32601

WATSON, VICTORIA A

120 West University Avenue

Gainesville, FL 32601

 

Court Documents

SURETY BOND

04/14/2021: SURETY BOND

SURETY BOND

04/14/2021: SURETY BOND

NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

04/13/2021: NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

ORDER APPOINTING THE PUBLIC DEFENDER

04/12/2021: ORDER APPOINTING THE PUBLIC DEFENDER

STANDING NO CONTACT ORDER PER AO 4.17

04/12/2021: STANDING NO CONTACT ORDER PER AO 4.17

FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

04/12/2021: FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

ARREST FORM

04/12/2021: ARREST FORM

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSURETY BOND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketARREST BOND ENTRY; ; Arrest Bond Added to Case with: ; Arrest Date: 04/11/2021 ; Initial Charge #: 2 ; Initial Action Code: ; Prosecutor Count #: ; Prosecutor Action Code: ; Custody Location: SURETY BOND ; Bond Status: Open ; Status Date: 04/12/2021 ; Bond Type: SURETY BOND ; Bond/Pwr No.: PSE5920714 ; Bond Amount: $5000 ; Bonding Co.: ANDRAE BRYANT BAIL BONDS ; Cash Depositor: ;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSURETY BOND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketARREST BOND ENTRY; ; Arrest Bond Added to Case with: ; Arrest Date: 04/11/2021 ; Initial Charge #: 1 ; Initial Action Code: ; Prosecutor Count #: ; Prosecutor Action Code: ; Custody Location: SURETY BOND ; Bond Status: Open ; Status Date: 04/12/2021 ; Bond Type: SURETY BOND ; Bond/Pwr No.: PSE151550704 ; Bond Amount: $15000 ; Bonding Co.: ANDRAE BRYANT BAIL BONDS ; Cash Depositor: ;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • BondCharge Number: 2; Bond Type: SURETY BOND; Bond Amount: $5,000.00; Power Number: PSE5920714; Bond Status: Open; Bonding Company: ANDRAE BRYANT BAIL BONDS; Insurance Company: PALMETTO SURETY CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • BondCharge Number: 1; Bond Type: SURETY BOND; Bond Amount: $15,000.00; Power Number: PSE151550704; Bond Status: Open; Bonding Company: ANDRAE BRYANT BAIL BONDS; Insurance Company: PALMETTO SURETY CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER APPOINTING THE PUBLIC DEFENDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTANDING NO CONTACT ORDER PER AO 4.17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE CRIMINAL HISTORY; SUMMARY - SEE LAST PAGE OF FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketPROVISIONAL ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketARREST FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer LIMOGE, VALERIE L