Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Alachua County Courts on 03/19/2020 at 21:28:56 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA -VS- REMIGIO-GONZALEZ, STEVEN SAMUEL

Case Summary

On 11/27/2018 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against REMIGIO-GONZALEZ, STEVEN SAMUEL. This case was filed in Alachua County Courts, Alachua County Criminal Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are DAVIS, WILLIAM E and MOSELEY, MARK W. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***************65 A

  • Filing Date:

    11/27/2018

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Alachua County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alachua County Criminal Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Alachua, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

DAVIS, WILLIAM E

MOSELEY, MARK W

 

Party Details

Defendants

REMIGIO-GONZALEZ, STEVEN SAMUEL

Ocala, FL 34482

REMIGIO GONZALEZ, STEVEN SAMUEL

Ocala, FL 34482

Not Yet Classified

WRIGHT, GEORGE

Gainesville, FL 32601

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Goldman, Canaan

151 Sw 2Nd Ave

Gainesville, FL 32601

Not Yet Classified Attorney

WRIGHT, GEORGE

120 W University Ave

Gainesville, FL 32601

 

Court Documents

CERTIFIED COPY OF CIVIL JUDGMENT

03/22/2019: CERTIFIED COPY OF CIVIL JUDGMENT

CIVIL JUDGMENT ENTERED

03/22/2019: CIVIL JUDGMENT ENTERED

DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS COMMITMENT PACKET//CAT

03/20/2019: DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS COMMITMENT PACKET//CAT

RESTITUTION ORDER - NOT APPLICABLE// DAVIS

03/19/2019: RESTITUTION ORDER - NOT APPLICABLE// DAVIS

VICTIM NOTIFICATION DATA SHEET

03/19/2019: VICTIM NOTIFICATION DATA SHEET

ORDER ESTABLISHING MONETARY SUMS // DAVIS

03/19/2019: ORDER ESTABLISHING MONETARY SUMS // DAVIS

FINGERPRINTS OF DEFENDANT

03/19/2019: FINGERPRINTS OF DEFENDANT

SCORE SHEET

03/19/2019: SCORE SHEET

PETITION TO ENTER PLEA GUILTY OR NOLO//ACCEPTED//@

03/19/2019: PETITION TO ENTER PLEA GUILTY OR NOLO//ACCEPTED//@

ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE TO DIVISION IV // MOSELEY

03/12/2019: ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE TO DIVISION IV // MOSELEY

MOTION TO TRANSFER DIVISIONS

03/12/2019: MOTION TO TRANSFER DIVISIONS

NOTICE ISSUED TO ATTORNEY FOR DEFENDANT

02/01/2019: NOTICE ISSUED TO ATTORNEY FOR DEFENDANT

INFORMATION FILED

01/30/2019: INFORMATION FILED

STATE'S DISCOVERY EXHIBIT

01/30/2019: STATE'S DISCOVERY EXHIBIT

WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY

12/05/2018: WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY

EMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

12/05/2018: EMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

11/29/2018: NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

ARREST FORM

11/28/2018: ARREST FORM

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/20/2019
  • DocketCASE (LIEN) FORWARDED TO COLLECTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • DocketCOLLECTIONS RECORD STAGED WITH LIEN AMOUNT OF $686.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • DocketMONETARY OBLIGATIONS AUDITED//hap

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFIED COPY OF CIVIL JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL JUDGMENT ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS COMMITMENT PACKET//CAT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • DocketAUDITED FOR CIVIL LIEN PURPOSES - $686.00 LIEN SENT TO JUDGE FOR SIGNATURE//BAM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • HearingTrial Status Conference; Judge: DAVIS, WILLIAM E; Result: HELD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • ChargeMARIJUANA-POSSESS: NOT MORE THAN 20 GRAMS; Charge: 2; Phase: COURT; Disposition: Guilty Adjudication

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • ChargeDRUGS-SELL: SELL METHAMPHETAMINE; Charge: 1; Phase: COURT; Disposition: Guilty Adjudication

    Read MoreRead Less
27 More Docket Entries
  • 12/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • DocketASSESSMENT - CF $50 INDIGENCE APPLICATION FEE; Amount: $50.00; Amount Due: $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENT STATUS (NOT INDIGENT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • DocketPROVISIONAL ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE CRIMINAL HISTORY; SUMMARY - SEE LAST PAGE OF FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketARREST FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • FinancialTotal Fee Owed: $686.00; Total Fee Paid: $0.00; Total Fee Dismissed: $0.00; Total Fee Due: $686.00

    Read MoreRead Less