This case was last updated from Alachua County - Eighth Judicial Circuit Court on 01/31/2023 at 19:51:21 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA -VS- REILLY, MICHAEL JOSEPH

Case Summary

On 11/10/2022 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against REILLY, MICHAEL JOSEPH. This case was filed in Alachua County - Eighth Judicial Circuit Court, Alachua County Criminal Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***************50 A

  • Filing Date:

    11/10/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

 

Party Details

Defendant

REILLY, MICHAEL JOSEPH

Bronson, FL 32621

Not Yet Classified

RILEY, ANNA - LISA MYERS

Gainesville, FL 32602

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Yet Classified Attorney

RILEY, ANNA - LISA MYERS

120 W University Ave

Gainesville, FL 32602

 

Court Documents

EMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

11/17/2022: EMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

Summons Issued (Do not delete)

01/04/2023: Summons Issued (Do not delete)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued (Do not delete)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • ChargeCYBER STALKING; Charge: 3; Phase: PROS; Disposition: NO ACTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • ChargeCYBER STALKING; Charge: 2; Phase: PROS; Disposition: NO ACTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • ChargeSTALKING; Charge: 1; Phase: PROS; Disposition: Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • DocketINFORMATION FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • DocketIssue Date: 01/03/2023; Service: SUMMONS ISSUED; Method: CRIMINAL SUMMONS TO SHERIFF FOR SERVICE; Cost Per: $; ; ; REILLY, MICHAEL JOSEPH; 435 MARSHBURN DRIVE; BRONSON, FL 32621; Tracking No: L000070796; ;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • DocketOBTS PRE-COURT ENTRY; Count: 1; PROSECUTOR PHASE; Charge Status: Same; Filing Date: 01/03/2023; Final Decision Date: 01/03/2023; Final Action: Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • DocketOBTS PRE-COURT ENTRY; Count: 2, 3; PROSECUTOR PHASE; Charge Status: Same; Final Decision Date: 01/03/2023; Final Action: No Action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • SummonSUMMONS ISSUED; Tracking #: L000070796

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • DocketSWORN COMPLAINT AFFIDAVIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer RILEY, ANNA - LISA MYERS