Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Alachua County Courts on 03/24/2021 at 16:13:23 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA -VS- RALOSKY, NATHANIEL TRAVIS

Case Summary

On 02/25/2021 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against RALOSKY, NATHANIEL TRAVIS. This case was filed in Alachua County Courts, Alachua County Criminal Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is COLAW, JAMES M. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***************09 A

  • Filing Date:

    02/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Alachua County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alachua County Criminal Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Alachua, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

COLAW, JAMES M

 

Party Details

Defendant

RALOSKY, NATHANIEL TRAVIS

Gainesville, FL 32608

Not Yet Classified

MARGULIES, DAVID

Gainesville, FL 32601

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Landsman, Matt D.

151 Sw 2Nd Ave

Gainesville, FL 32601

Not Yet Classified Attorney

MARGULIES, DAVID

120 W University Ave

Gainesville, FL 32601

 

Court Documents

NOTICE ISSUED TO ATTORNEY FOR DEFENDANT

03/19/2021: NOTICE ISSUED TO ATTORNEY FOR DEFENDANT

WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY

03/17/2021: WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY

NOTICE ISSUED TO ATTORNEY FOR DEFENDANT

03/12/2021: NOTICE ISSUED TO ATTORNEY FOR DEFENDANT

RELEASED ON RECOGNIZANCE

03/12/2021: RELEASED ON RECOGNIZANCE

NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

03/11/2021: NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

ORDER ON REQUEST FOR APPOINTMENT OF PUBLIC DEFENDER AND DETERMINATION OF CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS

03/11/2021: ORDER ON REQUEST FOR APPOINTMENT OF PUBLIC DEFENDER AND DETERMINATION OF CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS

STANDING NO CONTACT ORDER PER AO 4.17

03/11/2021: STANDING NO CONTACT ORDER PER AO 4.17

FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

03/11/2021: FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

ARREST FORM

03/11/2021: ARREST FORM

Capias Issued (Do not delete)

03/03/2021: Capias Issued (Do not delete)

DEFENDANT INFORMATION SHEET

03/02/2021: DEFENDANT INFORMATION SHEET

EMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

03/01/2021: EMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

INFORMATION FILED - DIRECT

02/25/2021: INFORMATION FILED - DIRECT

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/15/2021
  • HearingCase Management; Judge: COLAW, JAMES M

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • HearingArraignment; Judge: COLAW, JAMES M; Result: EVENT CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE ISSUED TO ATTORNEY FOR DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • DocketCRIMINAL COURT EVENT SET; Event: Case Management ; Date: 04/15/2021 Time: 2:00 pm ; Judge: CIRCUIT, DIVISION 3 CRIMINAL Location: CJC Courtroom 3-C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE ISSUED TO ATTORNEY FOR DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRELEASED ON RECOGNIZANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketASSESSMENT - CF $50 INDIGENCE APPLICATION FEE; Amount: $50.00; Amount Due: $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ON REQUEST FOR APPOINTMENT OF PUBLIC DEFENDER AND DETERMINATION OF CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketARREST FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketALERT SERVED; Capias served on: 03/10/2021 for: RALOSKY, NATHANIEL TRAVIS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketALERT ISSUED; Capias issued on: 03/03/2021 ; For: RALOSKY, NATHANIEL TRAVIS ; Bond Amt: 5000 ; Bond Type:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCapias Issued (Do not delete)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANT INFORMATION SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • ChargeFRAUD: INSURANCE FRAUD LESS THAN 20K DOLLARS; Charge: 1; Phase: PROS; Disposition: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • FinancialTotal Fee Owed: $50.00; Total Fee Paid: $0.00; Total Fee Dismissed: $0.00; Total Fee Due: $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketOBTS PRE-COURT ENTRY; Count: 1; PROSECUTOR PHASE; Filing Date: 02/25/2021; Final Decision Date: 02/25/2021; Final Action: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINFORMATION FILED - DIRECT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Landsman, Matt D.