Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Alachua County Courts on 06/16/2021 at 15:26:40 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA -VS- PINEDA, DANIEL LEDESMA

Case Summary

On 06/02/2021 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against PINEDA, DANIEL LEDESMA. This case was filed in Alachua County Courts, Alachua County Criminal Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are COLAW, JAMES M and GREEN, WALTER M. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***************43 A

  • Filing Date:

    06/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Alachua County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alachua County Criminal Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Alachua, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

COLAW, JAMES M

GREEN, WALTER M

 

Party Details

Defendant

PINEDA, DANIEL LEDESMA

Gainesville, FL 32607

Not Yet Classified

PICKENS, KRISTIN S

Gainesville, FL 32601

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

TENNEY, JOHN W

151 Sw 2Nd Ave

Gainesville, FL 32601

Not Yet Classified Attorney

PICKENS, KRISTIN S

120 W University Ave

Gainesville, FL 32601

 

Court Documents

INFORMATION FILED

06/11/2021: INFORMATION FILED

EMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

06/09/2021: EMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

NOTICE ISSUED TO DEFENDANT

06/07/2021: NOTICE ISSUED TO DEFENDANT

RECOGNIZANCE RELEASE TO SUPERVISION OF COURT SERVICES

06/03/2021: RECOGNIZANCE RELEASE TO SUPERVISION OF COURT SERVICES

NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

06/03/2021: NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

06/02/2021: FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

ARREST FORM

06/02/2021: ARREST FORM

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/01/2021
  • HearingArraignment; Judge: COLAW, JAMES M

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • HearingDrug Court Hearing; Judge: GREEN, WALTER M

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • DocketCRIMINAL COURT EVENT SET; Event: Arraignment ; Date: 07/01/2021 Time: 9:00 am ; Judge: CIRCUIT, DIVISION 3 CRIMINAL Location: CJC Courtroom 3-C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • ChargeDRUGS-POSSESS: CNTRL SUB WO PRESCRIPTION; Charge: 1; Phase: PROS; Disposition: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketOBTS PRE-COURT ENTRY; Count: 1; PROSECUTOR PHASE; Charge Status: Same; Filing Date: 06/11/2021; Final Decision Date: 06/11/2021; Final Action: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINFORMATION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE ISSUED TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketCRIMINAL COURT EVENT SET; Event: Drug Court Hearing ; Date: 06/25/2021 Time: 10:00 am ; Judge: COUNTY, DIVISION 3 CRIMINAL Location: CJC Courtroom 1-B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRECOGNIZANCE RELEASE TO SUPERVISION OF COURT SERVICES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE CRIMINAL HISTORY; SUMMARY - SEE LAST PAGE OF FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • DocketPROVISIONAL ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketARREST FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer PICKENS, KRISTIN S