This case was last updated from Alachua County - Eighth Judicial Circuit Court on 02/02/2023 at 14:26:01 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA -VS- PINDER, KEVIN JEROME

Case Summary

On 01/25/2023 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against PINDER, KEVIN JEROME. This case was filed in Alachua County - Eighth Judicial Circuit Court, Alachua County Criminal Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***************94 A

  • Filing Date:

    01/25/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

 

Party Details

Defendant

PINDER, KEVIN JEROME

Gainesville, FL 32607

Not Yet Classified

RILEY, ANNA - LISA MYERS

Gainesville, FL 32602

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Yet Classified Attorney

RILEY, ANNA - LISA MYERS

120 W University Ave

Gainesville, FL 32602

 

Court Documents

ARREST FORM

01/26/2023: ARREST FORM

FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

01/26/2023: FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

STANDING NO CONTACT ORDER PER AO 4.17

01/26/2023: STANDING NO CONTACT ORDER PER AO 4.17

RELEASED ON RECOGNIZANCE

01/27/2023: RELEASED ON RECOGNIZANCE

EMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

01/30/2023: EMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRELEASED ON RECOGNIZANCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTANDING NO CONTACT ORDER PER AO 4.17

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE CRIMINAL HISTORY; SUMMARY - SEE LAST PAGE OF FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketARREST FORM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less