Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Alachua County Courts on 04/20/2021 at 16:11:37 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA -VS- PERKINS, SHAMEIKA MILLER

Case Summary

On 03/22/2021 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against PERKINS, SHAMEIKA MILLER. This case was filed in Alachua County Courts, Alachua County Criminal Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is COLAW, JAMES M. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***************39 A

  • Filing Date:

    03/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Alachua County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alachua County Criminal Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Alachua, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

COLAW, JAMES M

 

Party Details

Defendants

PERKINS, SHAMEIKA MILLER

Gainesville, FL 32607

PERKINS, SHAMEITA

Gainesville, FL 32607

PERKINS, SHAMEIKA

Gainesville, FL 32607

SHAMEITA

915 Sw 61St St B

Gainesville, FL 32607

MILLER, SHAMEIKA RENEE

Gainesville, FL 32607

PERKINS, SHAMEIKA R

Gainesville, FL 32607

MILLER, SHIMEKA RENE

Gainesville, FL 32607

PERKINS, SHAMEIKA A

Gainesville, FL 32607

PERKINS, SHAMEKA

Gainesville, FL 32607

MILLER, SHAMIEKA R

Gainesville, FL 32607

Not Yet Classified

ALACHUA, FELONY CRIMES AGAINST

Gainesville, FL 32601

WATSON, VICTORIA A

Gainesville, FL 32601

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

TENNEY, JOHN W

151 Sw 2Nd Ave

Gainesville, FL 32601

Not Yet Classified Attorneys

ALACHUA, FELONY CRIMES AGAINST

120 W University Ave

Gainesville, FL 32601

WATSON, VICTORIA A

120 West University Avenue

Gainesville, FL 32601

 

Court Documents

ORDER DENYING MOTION TO REDUCE BOND // COLAW

04/08/2021: ORDER DENYING MOTION TO REDUCE BOND // COLAW

COURT ACTION MEMO

04/08/2021: COURT ACTION MEMO

EMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

03/30/2021: EMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

NOTICE OF HEARING

03/30/2021: NOTICE OF HEARING

NOTICE OF HEARING

03/30/2021: NOTICE OF HEARING

MOTION FOR BOND REDUCTION

03/30/2021: MOTION FOR BOND REDUCTION

NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

03/24/2021: NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

ORDER ON REQUEST FOR APPOINTMENT OF PUBLIC DEFENDER AND DETERMINATION OF CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS

03/23/2021: ORDER ON REQUEST FOR APPOINTMENT OF PUBLIC DEFENDER AND DETERMINATION OF CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS

STANDING NO CONTACT ORDER PER AO 4.17

03/23/2021: STANDING NO CONTACT ORDER PER AO 4.17

FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

03/23/2021: FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

ARREST FORM

03/23/2021: ARREST FORM

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/08/2021
  • HearingBond Hearing; Judge: COLAW, JAMES M; Result: HELD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER DENYING MOTION TO REDUCE BOND // COLAW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT ACTION MEMO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketCRIMINAL COURT EVENT SET; Event: Bond Hearing ; Date: 04/08/2021 Time: 1:30 pm ; Judge: CIRCUIT, DIVISION 3 CRIMINAL Location: CJC Courtroom 2-C; ; Result: HELD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR BOND REDUCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketASSESSMENT - CF $50 INDIGENCE APPLICATION FEE; Amount: $50.00; Amount Due: $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ON REQUEST FOR APPOINTMENT OF PUBLIC DEFENDER AND DETERMINATION OF CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTANDING NO CONTACT ORDER PER AO 4.17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE CRIMINAL HISTORY; SUMMARY - SEE LAST PAGE OF FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketPROVISIONAL ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketARREST FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • FinancialTotal Fee Owed: $50.00; Total Fee Paid: $0.00; Total Fee Dismissed: $0.00; Total Fee Due: $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer WATSON, VICTORIA A