Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Alachua County Courts on 05/01/2021 at 16:38:28 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA -VS- PEEBLES, KEVON D

Case Summary

On 04/03/2021 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against PEEBLES, KEVON D. This case was filed in Alachua County Courts, Alachua County Criminal Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is COLAW, JAMES M. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***************94 A

  • Filing Date:

    04/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Alachua County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alachua County Criminal Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Alachua, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

COLAW, JAMES M

 

Party Details

Defendant

PEEBLES, KEVON D

Gainesville, FL 32607

Not Yet Classified

ALACHUA, FELONY GUN

Gainesville, FL 32601

MARGULIES, DAVID

Gainesville, FL 32601

BRYANT, ANDRAE

Gainesville, FL 32609

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

LIMOGE, VALERIE L

151 Sw 2Nd Ave

Gainesville, FL 32601

MCDONALD ESQ, ALISHIA W

309 Ne 1St St

Gainesville, FL 32601

Not Yet Classified Attorneys

ALACHUA, FELONY GUN

120 W University Ave

Gainesville, FL 32601

MARGULIES, DAVID

120 W University Ave

Gainesville, FL 32601

 

Court Documents

SURETY BOND

04/22/2021: SURETY BOND

SURETY BOND

04/22/2021: SURETY BOND

SURETY BOND

04/22/2021: SURETY BOND

SURETY BOND

04/22/2021: SURETY BOND

SURETY BOND

04/22/2021: SURETY BOND

AMENDED ORDER GRANTING MODIFY AND/OR REDUCE BOND AS TO THE CORRECT BOND AMOUNT AS TO COUNT 5 , (e) // COLAW

04/15/2021: AMENDED ORDER GRANTING MODIFY AND/OR REDUCE BOND AS TO THE CORRECT BOND AMOUNT AS TO COUNT 5 , (e) // COLAW

ORDER GRANTING MODIFY AND/OR REDUCE BOND // COLAW

04/15/2021: ORDER GRANTING MODIFY AND/OR REDUCE BOND // COLAW

COURT ACTION MEMO

04/15/2021: COURT ACTION MEMO

EMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

04/15/2021: EMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

NOTICE OF HEARING

04/12/2021: NOTICE OF HEARING

ORDER SUBSTITUTING COUNSEL OF RECORD

04/09/2021: ORDER SUBSTITUTING COUNSEL OF RECORD

MOTION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL

04/08/2021: MOTION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL

MOTION FOR BOND REDUCTION

04/07/2021: MOTION FOR BOND REDUCTION

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY AND DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY

04/07/2021: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY AND DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY

NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

04/05/2021: NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

04/04/2021: FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

ARREST FORM

04/04/2021: ARREST FORM

ORDER ON REQUEST FOR APPOINTMENT OF PUBLIC DEFENDER AND DETERMINATION OF CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS

04/04/2021: ORDER ON REQUEST FOR APPOINTMENT OF PUBLIC DEFENDER AND DETERMINATION OF CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSURETY BOND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • DocketARREST BOND ENTRY; ; Arrest Bond Added to Case with: ; Arrest Date: 04/03/2021 ; Initial Charge #: 5 ; Initial Action Code: ; Prosecutor Count #: ; Prosecutor Action Code: ; Custody Location: SURETY BOND ; Bond Status: Open ; Status Date: 04/21/2021 ; Bond Type: SURETY BOND ; Bond/Pwr No.: PSE5920717 ; Bond Amount: $5000 ; Bonding Co.: ANDRAE BRYANT BAIL BONDS ; Cash Depositor: ;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSURETY BOND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • DocketARREST BOND ENTRY; ; Arrest Bond Added to Case with: ; Arrest Date: 04/03/2021 ; Initial Charge #: 4 ; Initial Action Code: ; Prosecutor Count #: ; Prosecutor Action Code: ; Custody Location: SURETY BOND ; Bond Status: Open ; Status Date: 04/21/2021 ; Bond Type: SURETY BOND ; Bond/Pwr No.: PSE25917619 ; Bond Amount: $15000 ; Bonding Co.: ANDRAE BRYANT BAIL BONDS ; Cash Depositor: ;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSURETY BOND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • DocketARREST BOND ENTRY; ; Arrest Bond Added to Case with: ; Arrest Date: 04/03/2021 ; Initial Charge #: 3 ; Initial Action Code: ; Prosecutor Count #: ; Prosecutor Action Code: ; Custody Location: SURETY BOND ; Bond Status: Open ; Status Date: 04/21/2021 ; Bond Type: SURETY BOND ; Bond/Pwr No.: PSE25917618 ; Bond Amount: $15000 ; Bonding Co.: ANDRAE BRYANT BAIL BONDS ; Cash Depositor: ;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSURETY BOND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • DocketARREST BOND ENTRY; ; Arrest Bond Added to Case with: ; Arrest Date: 04/03/2021 ; Initial Charge #: 2 ; Initial Action Code: ; Prosecutor Count #: ; Prosecutor Action Code: ; Custody Location: SURETY BOND ; Bond Status: Open ; Status Date: 04/21/2021 ; Bond Type: SURETY BOND ; Bond/Pwr No.: PSE25917617 ; Bond Amount: $25000 ; Bonding Co.: ANDRAE BRYANT BAIL BONDS ; Cash Depositor: ;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSURETY BOND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • DocketARREST BOND ENTRY; ; Arrest Bond Added to Case with: ; Arrest Date: 04/03/2021 ; Initial Charge #: 1 ; Initial Action Code: ; Prosecutor Count #: ; Prosecutor Action Code: ; Custody Location: SURETY BOND ; Bond Status: Open ; Status Date: 04/21/2021 ; Bond Type: SURETY BOND ; Bond/Pwr No.: PSE151550708 ; Bond Amount: $15000 ; Bonding Co.: ANDRAE BRYANT BAIL BONDS ; Cash Depositor: ;

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 04/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR BOND REDUCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE, WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY AND DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2021
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE CRIMINAL HISTORY; SUMMARY - SEE LAST PAGE OF FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2021
  • DocketPROVISIONAL ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketARREST FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2021
  • DocketASSESSMENT - CF $50 INDIGENCE APPLICATION FEE; Amount: $50.00; Amount Due: $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ON REQUEST FOR APPOINTMENT OF PUBLIC DEFENDER AND DETERMINATION OF CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2021
  • FinancialTotal Fee Owed: $50.00; Total Fee Paid: $0.00; Total Fee Dismissed: $0.00; Total Fee Due: $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer ALISHIA W MCDONALD

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LIMOGE, VALERIE L