Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Alachua County Courts on 02/03/2020 at 21:49:00 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA -VS- PATTERSON, ANTONIO EUGENE

Case Summary

On 03/25/2017 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against PATTERSON, ANTONIO EUGENE. This case was filed in Alachua County Courts, Alachua County Criminal Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***************02 A

  • Filing Date:

    03/25/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Alachua County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alachua County Criminal Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Alachua, Florida

 

Party Details

Defendant

PATTERSON, ANTONIO EUGENE

Interlachen, FL 32148

Not Yet Classified

HECHAVARRIA, OMAR

Gainesville, FL 32601

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

HINES ESQ, MICHAEL B.

317 Ne 1St Street

Gainesville, FL 32601

Not Yet Classified Attorney

HECHAVARRIA, OMAR

120 W. University Ave

Gainesville, FL 32601

 

Court Documents

EMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

07/17/2017: EMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

ORDER TO MODIFY PRETRIAL RELEASE

05/23/2017: ORDER TO MODIFY PRETRIAL RELEASE

MOTION TO MODIFY PRE-TRIAL RELEASE

05/23/2017: MOTION TO MODIFY PRE-TRIAL RELEASE

WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY

04/27/2017: WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

04/27/2017: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO WITHDRAW & APPOINTING CONFLICT ATTORNEY

04/26/2017: ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO WITHDRAW & APPOINTING CONFLICT ATTORNEY

MOTION TO WITHDRAW

04/26/2017: MOTION TO WITHDRAW

ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO WITHDRAW AND APPOINTING REGIONAL COUNSEL

04/19/2017: ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO WITHDRAW AND APPOINTING REGIONAL COUNSEL

MOTION TO WITHDRAW

04/19/2017: MOTION TO WITHDRAW

CERTIFICATION OF CONFLICT OF INTEREST BETWEEN THE DEFENDANTS

04/19/2017: CERTIFICATION OF CONFLICT OF INTEREST BETWEEN THE DEFENDANTS

MOTION TO WITHDRAW

04/19/2017: MOTION TO WITHDRAW

CERTIFICATION OF CONFLICT OF INTEREST BETWEEN THE DEFENDANTS

04/19/2017: CERTIFICATION OF CONFLICT OF INTEREST BETWEEN THE DEFENDANTS

EMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

03/30/2017: EMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

03/28/2017: NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY

03/28/2017: WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY

STANDING NO CONTACT ORDER PER AO 4.17

03/27/2017: STANDING NO CONTACT ORDER PER AO 4.17

FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

03/27/2017: FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

ARREST FORM

03/27/2017: ARREST FORM

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/18/2017
  • DocketCase Transferred; New case: 2017 CF 002638 B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2017
  • ChargeFRAUD-SWINDLE: OBTAIN PROPERTY UNDER 20K DOLS; Charge: 2; Phase: PROS; Disposition: NO ACTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2017
  • ChargeLARC: GRAND THEFT 10K LESS THAN 20K DOLS; Charge: 1; Phase: PROS; Disposition: Consolidated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2017
  • DocketOBTS PRE-COURT ENTRY; Count: 2; PROSECUTOR PHASE; Charge Status: Same; Final Decision Date: 07/17/2017; Final Action: No Action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER TO MODIFY PRETRIAL RELEASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO MODIFY PRE-TRIAL RELEASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 04/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATION OF CONFLICT OF INTEREST BETWEEN THE DEFENDANTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRECOGNIZANCE RELEASE TO SUPERVISION OF COURT SERVICES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTANDING NO CONTACT ORDER PER AO 4.17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2017
  • DocketPROVISIONAL ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2017
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE CRIMINAL HISTORY; SUMMARY - SEE LAST PAGE OF FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketARREST FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer HINES ESQ, MICHAEL B.