This case was last updated from Alachua County - Eighth Judicial Circuit Court on 01/10/2023 at 12:24:05 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA -VS- PASTRANA, ELIZABETH ANN

Case Summary

On 11/10/2022 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against PASTRANA, ELIZABETH ANN. This case was filed in Alachua County - Eighth Judicial Circuit Court, Alachua County Criminal Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***************48 A

  • Filing Date:

    11/10/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

 

Party Details

Defendant

PASTRANA, ELIZABETH ANN

Gainesville, FL 32608

Not Yet Classified

RILEY, ANNA - LISA MYERS

Gainesville, FL 32602

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Yet Classified Attorney

RILEY, ANNA - LISA MYERS

120 W University Ave

Gainesville, FL 32602

 

Court Documents

EMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

11/17/2022: EMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

Summons Issued (Do not delete)

01/04/2023: Summons Issued (Do not delete)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued (Do not delete)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • ChargeDOMESTIC BATTERY: TOUCH OR STRIKE; Charge: 1; Phase: PROS; Disposition: Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • DocketINFORMATION FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • DocketIssue Date: 01/03/2023; Service: SUMMONS ISSUED; Method: CRIMINAL SUMMONS TO SHERIFF FOR SERVICE; Cost Per: $; ; ; PASTRANA, ELIZABETH ANN; 2323 SW 35TH PL APT 3G; GAINESVILLE, FL 32608; Tracking No: L000070795; ;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • DocketOBTS PRE-COURT ENTRY; Count: 1; PROSECUTOR PHASE; Charge Status: Same; Filing Date: 01/03/2023; Final Decision Date: 01/03/2023; Final Action: Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • SummonSUMMONS ISSUED; Tracking #: L000070795

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • DocketSWORN COMPLAINT AFFIDAVIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer RILEY, ANNA - LISA MYERS