Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Alachua County Courts on 03/19/2020 at 16:54:23 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA -VS- PARKS, REBECCA JEANNE

Case Summary

On 01/30/2020 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against PARKS, REBECCA JEANNE. This case was filed in Alachua County Courts, Alachua County Criminal Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***************37 A

  • Filing Date:

    01/30/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Alachua County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alachua County Criminal Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Alachua, Florida

 

Party Details

Defendant

PARKS, REBECCA JEANNE

Lady Lake, FL 32162

Not Yet Classified

ALACHUA, FELONY DIVISION III

Gainesville, FL 32601

BAKER, TYRONE

Gainesville, FL 32641

GAGE, CHRISTOPHER

Gainesville, FL 32602

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

McGill, Francis Andrew

151 Sw 2Nd Ave

Gainesville, FL 32601

Not Yet Classified Attorneys

ALACHUA, FELONY DIVISION III

120 W University Ave

Gainesville, FL 32601

GAGE, CHRISTOPHER

120 W University Ave

Gainesville, FL 32602

 

Court Documents

EMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

02/06/2020: EMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

SURETY BOND

02/03/2020: SURETY BOND

SURETY BOND

02/03/2020: SURETY BOND

SURETY BOND

02/03/2020: SURETY BOND

WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY

02/03/2020: WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY

NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

02/03/2020: NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

01/31/2020: FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

ARREST FORM

01/31/2020: ARREST FORM

UNIFORM TRAFFIC CITATION FILED #A3FYQ8

01/31/2020: UNIFORM TRAFFIC CITATION FILED #A3FYQ8

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/06/2020
  • DocketEMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • DocketARREST BOND ENTRY; ; Ref: Bond/Pwr No.: 2020A012072 ; Initial Charge #: 2 ; Initial Action Code: DRUG EQUIP-POSSESS: AND OR USE ; Prosecutor Count #: ; Prosecutor Action Code: ; Bonding Co.: TYRONE BAKER BAIL BONDS ; Bond Amount: $2000 ; The following field(s) on arrest bond 2 have been modified: ; Old Status Date: 01/31/2019 ; New Status Date: 01/31/2020 ;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • DocketARREST BOND ENTRY; ; Ref: Bond/Pwr No.: 2020AA012071 ; Initial Charge #: 1 ; Initial Action Code: DRUGS-POSSESS: CNTRL SUB WO PRESCRIPTION ; Prosecutor Count #: ; Prosecutor Action Code: ; Bonding Co.: TYRONE BAKER BAIL BONDS ; Bond Amount: $3000 ; The following field(s) on arrest bond 1 have been modified: ; Old Status Date: 01/31/2019 ; New Status Date: 01/31/2020 ;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • DocketARREST BOND ENTRY; ; Arrest Bond Added to Case with: ; Arrest Date: 01/30/2020 ; Initial Charge #: 3 ; Initial Action Code: ; Prosecutor Count #: ; Prosecutor Action Code: ; Custody Location: SURETY BOND ; Bond Status: Open ; Status Date: 01/31/2020 ; Bond Type: SURETY BOND ; Bond/Pwr No.: 2020AA012073 ; Bond Amount: $3000 ; Bonding Co.: TYRONE BAKER BAIL BONDS ; Cash Depositor: ;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • DocketSURETY BOND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • DocketARREST BOND ENTRY; ; Arrest Bond Added to Case with: ; Arrest Date: 01/30/2020 ; Initial Charge #: 2 ; Initial Action Code: ; Prosecutor Count #: ; Prosecutor Action Code: ; Custody Location: SURETY BOND ; Bond Status: Open ; Status Date: 01/31/2019 ; Bond Type: SURETY BOND ; Bond/Pwr No.: 2020A012072 ; Bond Amount: $2000 ; Bonding Co.: TYRONE BAKER BAIL BONDS ; Cash Depositor: ;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • DocketSURETY BOND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • DocketARREST BOND ENTRY; ; Arrest Bond Added to Case with: ; Arrest Date: 01/30/2020 ; Initial Charge #: 1 ; Initial Action Code: ; Prosecutor Count #: ; Prosecutor Action Code: ; Custody Location: SURETY BOND ; Bond Status: Open ; Status Date: 01/31/2019 ; Bond Type: SURETY BOND ; Bond/Pwr No.: 2020AA012071 ; Bond Amount: $3000 ; Bonding Co.: TYRONE BAKER BAIL BONDS ; Cash Depositor: ;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • DocketSURETY BOND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • DocketWRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • BondCharge Number: 3; Bond Type: SURETY BOND; Bond Amount: $3,000.00; Power Number: 2020AA012073; Bond Status: Open; Bonding Company: TYRONE BAKER BAIL BONDS; Insurance Company: LEXINGTON NATIONAL INS CORP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • BondCharge Number: 2; Bond Type: SURETY BOND; Bond Amount: $2,000.00; Power Number: 2020A012072; Bond Status: Open; Bonding Company: TYRONE BAKER BAIL BONDS; Insurance Company: LEXINGTON NATIONAL INS CORP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • BondCharge Number: 1; Bond Type: SURETY BOND; Bond Amount: $3,000.00; Power Number: 2020AA012071; Bond Status: Open; Bonding Company: TYRONE BAKER BAIL BONDS; Insurance Company: LEXINGTON NATIONAL INS CORP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE CRIMINAL HISTORY; SUMMARY - SEE LAST PAGE OF FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketPROVISIONAL ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketDRIVING RECORD, DPPA-COMPLIANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketARREST FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketUNIFORM TRAFFIC CITATION FILED #A3FYQ8

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer McGill, Francis Andrew