This case was last updated from Alachua County Courts on 09/28/2021 at 16:29:59 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA -VS- PACHECO, GILBERT

Case Summary

On 08/31/2021 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against PACHECO, GILBERT. This case was filed in Alachua County Courts, Alachua County Criminal Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***************74 A

  • Filing Date:

    08/31/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Alachua, Florida

 

Party Details

Defendant

PACHECO, GILBERT

Ocala, FL 34473

Not Yet Classified

RODGERS, ANGELA H

Gainesville, FL 32601

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

LIMOGE, VALERIE L

151 Sw 2Nd Ave

Gainesville, FL 32601

FLOYD, JOHN O

Office Of The Regional Counsel, 235 South Main St., Suite 205

Gainesville, FL 32601

Not Yet Classified Attorney

RODGERS, ANGELA H

120 W University Ave

Gainesville, FL 32601

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY AND DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY

09/27/2021: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY AND DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY

ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO WITHDRAW AND APPOINTING REGIONAL COUNSEL

09/27/2021: ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO WITHDRAW AND APPOINTING REGIONAL COUNSEL

MOTION TO WITHDRAW

09/24/2021: MOTION TO WITHDRAW

CERTIFICATION OF CONFLICT OF INTEREST BETWEEN THE DEFENDANTS

09/24/2021: CERTIFICATION OF CONFLICT OF INTEREST BETWEEN THE DEFENDANTS

RESPONSE FROM JUDICIAL ASSISTANT

09/13/2021: RESPONSE FROM JUDICIAL ASSISTANT

LETTER OF SUPPORT

09/13/2021: LETTER OF SUPPORT

EMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

09/13/2021: EMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

09/10/2021: NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

STANDING NO CONTACT ORDER PER AO 4.17

09/10/2021: STANDING NO CONTACT ORDER PER AO 4.17

FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

09/10/2021: FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

ARREST FORM

09/10/2021: ARREST FORM

ORDER ON REQUEST FOR APPOINTMENT OF PUBLIC DEFENDER AND DETERMINATION OF CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS

09/10/2021: ORDER ON REQUEST FOR APPOINTMENT OF PUBLIC DEFENDER AND DETERMINATION OF CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS

Bench Warrant Issued

08/31/2021: Bench Warrant Issued

DEFENDANT INFORMATION SHEET

08/31/2021: DEFENDANT INFORMATION SHEET

SWORN COMPLAINT AFFIDAVIT

08/31/2021: SWORN COMPLAINT AFFIDAVIT

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE, WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY AND DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER GRANTING MOTION TO WITHDRAW AND APPOINTING REGIONAL COUNSEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO WITHDRAW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATION OF CONFLICT OF INTEREST BETWEEN THE DEFENDANTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE FROM JUDICIAL ASSISTANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER OF SUPPORT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTANDING NO CONTACT ORDER PER AO 4.17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE CRIMINAL HISTORY; SUMMARY - SEE LAST PAGE OF FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketARREST FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • DocketASSESSMENT - CF $50 INDIGENCE APPLICATION FEE; Amount: $50.00; Amount Due: $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ON REQUEST FOR APPOINTMENT OF PUBLIC DEFENDER AND DETERMINATION OF CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketALERT SERVED; BENCH WARRANT served on: 09/09/2021 for: PACHECO, GILBERT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • FinancialTotal Fee Owed: $50.00; Total Fee Paid: $0.00; Total Fee Dismissed: $0.00; Total Fee Due: $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketALERT ISSUED; BENCH WARRANT issued on: 08/31/2021 ; For: PACHECO, GILBERT ; Bond Amt: 75000 ; Bond Type:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBench Warrant Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANT INFORMATION SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSWORN COMPLAINT AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer RODGERS, ANGELA H