Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Alachua County Courts on 06/18/2021 at 15:22:31 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA -VS- OLIVER, JAYLON AHMOD

Case Summary

On 06/04/2021 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against OLIVER, JAYLON AHMOD. This case was filed in Alachua County Courts, Alachua County Criminal Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***************89 A

  • Filing Date:

    06/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Alachua County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alachua County Criminal Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Alachua, Florida

 

Party Details

Defendant

OLIVER, JAYLON AHMOD

Gainesville, FL 32605

Not Yet Classified

ALACHUA, FELONY GUN

Gainesville, FL 32601

WATSON, VICTORIA A

Gainesville, FL 32601

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

LIMOGE, VALERIE L

151 Sw 2Nd Ave

Gainesville, FL 32601

FRISCO ESQ, STEVEN G

11 Se 2Nd Ave

Gainesville, FL 32601

Not Yet Classified Attorneys

ALACHUA, FELONY GUN

120 W University Ave

Gainesville, FL 32601

WATSON, VICTORIA A

120 West University Avenue

Gainesville, FL 32601

 

Court Documents

ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO WITHDRAW///COLAW

06/10/2021: ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO WITHDRAW///COLAW

MOTION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL

06/09/2021: MOTION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY AND DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY

06/09/2021: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY AND DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY

PERMISSION TO USE E-MAIL

06/09/2021: PERMISSION TO USE E-MAIL

NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

06/07/2021: NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

STANDING NO CONTACT ORDER PER AO 4.17

06/05/2021: STANDING NO CONTACT ORDER PER AO 4.17

FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

06/05/2021: FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

ARREST FORM

06/05/2021: ARREST FORM

ORDER ON REQUEST FOR APPOINTMENT OF PUBLIC DEFENDER AND DETERMINATION OF CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS

06/05/2021: ORDER ON REQUEST FOR APPOINTMENT OF PUBLIC DEFENDER AND DETERMINATION OF CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER GRANTING MOTION TO WITHDRAW///COLAW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE, WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY AND DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPERMISSION TO USE E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTANDING NO CONTACT ORDER PER AO 4.17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2021
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE CRIMINAL HISTORY; SUMMARY - SEE LAST PAGE OF FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2021
  • DocketPROVISIONAL ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketARREST FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2021
  • DocketASSESSMENT - CF $50 INDIGENCE APPLICATION FEE; Amount: $50.00; Amount Due: $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ON REQUEST FOR APPOINTMENT OF PUBLIC DEFENDER AND DETERMINATION OF CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • FinancialTotal Fee Owed: $50.00; Total Fee Paid: $0.00; Total Fee Dismissed: $0.00; Total Fee Due: $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer WATSON, VICTORIA A