Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Alachua County Courts on 03/19/2020 at 08:41:12 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA -VS- OBEIDAT, DIMA HASAN FAWWAZ

Case Summary

On 01/05/2020 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against OBEIDAT, DIMA HASAN FAWWAZ. This case was filed in Alachua County Courts, Alachua County Criminal Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***************63 A

  • Filing Date:

    01/05/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Alachua County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alachua County Criminal Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Alachua, Florida

 

Party Details

Defendant

OBEIDAT, DIMA HASAN FAWWAZ

Gainesville, FL 32608

Not Yet Classified

LEPIANKA, LUA JM

Gainesville, FL 32601

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

McGill, Francis Andrew

151 Sw 2Nd Ave

Gainesville, FL 32601

Not Yet Classified Attorney

LEPIANKA, LUA JM

120 West University Ave

Gainesville, FL 32601

 

Court Documents

EMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

01/09/2020: EMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

01/06/2020: FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENT STATUS (INDIGENT)

01/22/2020: AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENT STATUS (INDIGENT)

WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY

01/07/2020: WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY

ARREST FORM

01/06/2020: ARREST FORM

REPORT OF MENTAL HEALTH EVALUATION

01/07/2020: REPORT OF MENTAL HEALTH EVALUATION

STANDING NO CONTACT ORDER PER AO 4.17

01/06/2020: STANDING NO CONTACT ORDER PER AO 4.17

ORDER OF NON-ACCEPTANCE TO MENTAL HEALTH COURT

01/08/2020: ORDER OF NON-ACCEPTANCE TO MENTAL HEALTH COURT

NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

01/07/2020: NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketASSESSMENT - CF $50 INDIGENCE APPLICATION FEE; Amount: $50.00; Amount Due: $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENT STATUS (INDIGENT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER OF NON-ACCEPTANCE TO MENTAL HEALTH COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREPORT OF MENTAL HEALTH EVALUATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTANDING NO CONTACT ORDER PER AO 4.17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE CRIMINAL HISTORY; SUMMARY - SEE LAST PAGE OF FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketPROVISIONAL ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketARREST FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2020
  • FinancialTotal Fee Owed: $50.00; Total Fee Paid: $0.00; Total Fee Dismissed: $0.00; Total Fee Due: $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less