This case was last updated from Alachua County Courts on 02/02/2022 at 16:08:43 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA -VS- NORTON, SCOTTY TERRELL

Case Summary

On 01/05/2022 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against NORTON, SCOTTY TERRELL. This case was filed in Alachua County Courts, Alachua County Criminal Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***************46 A

  • Filing Date:

    01/05/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Alachua, Florida

 

Party Details

Defendants

NORTON, SCOTTY TERRELL

Lloyd, FL 32337

NORTON, SCOTTY TERELL

Not Yet Classified

ALACHUA, FELONY DIVISION III

Gainesville, FL 32601

MARGULIES, DAVID

Gainesville, FL 32601

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Landsman, Matt D.

151 Sw 2Nd Ave

Gainesville, FL 32601

Not Yet Classified Attorneys

ALACHUA, FELONY DIVISION III

120 W University Ave

Gainesville, FL 32601

MARGULIES, DAVID

120 W University Ave

Gainesville, FL 32601

 

Court Documents

ARREST FORM

01/05/2022: ARREST FORM

UNIFORM TRAFFIC CITATION FILED #AERM1NE

01/05/2022: UNIFORM TRAFFIC CITATION FILED #AERM1NE

UNIFORM TRAFFIC CITATION FILED #AERM1NE

01/05/2022: UNIFORM TRAFFIC CITATION FILED #AERM1NE

FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

01/05/2022: FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

STANDING NO CONTACT ORDER PER AO 4.17

01/05/2022: STANDING NO CONTACT ORDER PER AO 4.17

NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

01/05/2022: NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

EMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

01/10/2022: EMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

STATE'S DISCOVERY EXHIBIT

01/31/2022: STATE'S DISCOVERY EXHIBIT

INFORMATION FILED

02/01/2022: INFORMATION FILED

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINFORMATION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATE'S DISCOVERY EXHIBIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • DocketDRIVING RECORD, DPPA-COMPLIANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTANDING NO CONTACT ORDER PER AO 4.17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE CRIMINAL HISTORY; SUMMARY - SEE LAST PAGE OF FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • DocketPROVISIONAL ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUNIFORM TRAFFIC CITATION FILED #AERM1NE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUNIFORM TRAFFIC CITATION FILED #AERM1NE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketARREST FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MARGULIES, DAVID