Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Alachua County Courts on 06/25/2021 at 16:01:57 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA -VS- NORTON, SCOTTY TERRELL

Case Summary

On 05/28/2021 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against NORTON, SCOTTY TERRELL. This case was filed in Alachua County Courts, Alachua County Criminal Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is COLAW, JAMES M. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***************01 A

  • Filing Date:

    05/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Alachua County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alachua County Criminal Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Alachua, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

COLAW, JAMES M

 

Party Details

Defendant

NORTON, SCOTTY TERRELL

Lloyd, FL 32337

Not Yet Classified

MARGULIES, DAVID

Gainesville, FL 32601

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

TENNEY, JOHN W

151 Sw 2Nd Ave

Gainesville, FL 32601

Not Yet Classified Attorney

MARGULIES, DAVID

120 W University Ave

Gainesville, FL 32601

 

Court Documents

ORDER DENYING MOTION TO REDUCE BOND

06/10/2021: ORDER DENYING MOTION TO REDUCE BOND

COURT ACTION MEMO

06/10/2021: COURT ACTION MEMO

EMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

06/03/2021: EMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

MOTION FOR BOND REDUCTION

06/03/2021: MOTION FOR BOND REDUCTION

NOTICE OF HEARING

06/03/2021: NOTICE OF HEARING

NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

06/03/2021: NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

STANDING NO CONTACT ORDER PER AO 4.17

05/28/2021: STANDING NO CONTACT ORDER PER AO 4.17

FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

05/28/2021: FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

ARREST FORM

05/28/2021: ARREST FORM

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/24/2021
  • ChargeRESIST OFFICER-OBSTRUCT WO VIOLENCE; Charge: 4; Phase: PROS; Disposition: Dropped/Abandoned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • ChargeDRUG EQUIP-POSSESS: AND OR USE; Charge: 3; Phase: PROS; Disposition: Dropped/Abandoned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • ChargeMARIJUANA-POSSESS: NOT MORE THAN 20 GRAMS; Charge: 2; Phase: PROS; Disposition: Dropped/Abandoned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • ChargeCOCAINE-POSSESS: POSSESS COCAINE; Charge: 1; Phase: PROS; Disposition: Dropped/Abandoned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • DocketCASE ACTION REPORT: NOLLE/NO INFO FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • DocketOBTS PRE-COURT ENTRY; Count: 1, 2, 3, 4; PROSECUTOR PHASE; Charge Status: Same; Final Decision Date: 06/24/2021; Final Action: Dropped/Abandoned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • HearingBond Hearing; Judge: COLAW, JAMES M; Result: HELD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER DENYING MOTION TO REDUCE BOND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT ACTION MEMO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR BOND REDUCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • DocketCRIMINAL COURT EVENT SET; Event: Bond Hearing ; Date: 06/10/2021 Time: 1:30 pm ; Judge: CIRCUIT, DIVISION 3 CRIMINAL Location: CJC Courtroom 2-C; ; Result: HELD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTANDING NO CONTACT ORDER PER AO 4.17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE CRIMINAL HISTORY; SUMMARY - SEE LAST PAGE OF FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • DocketPROVISIONAL ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketARREST FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MARGULIES, DAVID