This case was last updated from Eighth Circuit Courts - Alachua County on 10/17/2021 at 16:01:52 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA -VS- NOBLITT, JUSTIN EDWARD

Case Summary

On 09/19/2021 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against NOBLITT, JUSTIN EDWARD. This case was filed in Eighth Circuit Courts - Alachua County, Alachua County Criminal Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***************18 A

  • Filing Date:

    09/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Alachua, Florida

 

Party Details

Defendants

NOBLITT, JUSTIN EDWARD

Gainesville, FL 32609

FL/ID CARD, EXP 2029

Gainesville, FL 32609

Not Yet Classified

CHIN, ASHLEY

Gainesville, FL 32601

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

BULLOCK, ORAN LOTT

151 Sw 2Nd Ave

Gainesville, FL 32601

Not Yet Classified Attorney

CHIN, ASHLEY

120 W. University Ave

Gainesville, FL 32601

 

Court Documents

REPORT OF VIOLATION OF THE CONDITIONS OF PRETRIAL RELEASE

10/15/2021: REPORT OF VIOLATION OF THE CONDITIONS OF PRETRIAL RELEASE

EMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

09/23/2021: EMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

09/21/2021: NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

RECOGNIZANCE RELEASE TO SUPERVISION OF COURT SERVICES

09/20/2021: RECOGNIZANCE RELEASE TO SUPERVISION OF COURT SERVICES

ORDER ON REQUEST FOR APPOINTMENT OF PUBLIC DEFENDER AND DETERMINATION OF CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS

09/19/2021: ORDER ON REQUEST FOR APPOINTMENT OF PUBLIC DEFENDER AND DETERMINATION OF CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS

STANDING NO CONTACT ORDER PER AO 4.17

09/19/2021: STANDING NO CONTACT ORDER PER AO 4.17

FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

09/19/2021: FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

ARREST FORM

09/19/2021: ARREST FORM

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREPORT OF VIOLATION OF THE CONDITIONS OF PRETRIAL RELEASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRECOGNIZANCE RELEASE TO SUPERVISION OF COURT SERVICES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2021
  • FinancialTotal Fee Owed: $50.00; Total Fee Paid: $0.00; Total Fee Dismissed: $0.00; Total Fee Due: $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2021
  • DocketASSESSMENT - MM $50 INDIGENCE APPLICATION FEE; Amount: $50.00; Amount Due: $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ON REQUEST FOR APPOINTMENT OF PUBLIC DEFENDER AND DETERMINATION OF CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTANDING NO CONTACT ORDER PER AO 4.17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2021
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE CRIMINAL HISTORY; SUMMARY - SEE LAST PAGE OF FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2021
  • DocketPROVISIONAL ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketARREST FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer CHIN, ASHLEY