Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Alachua County Courts on 04/02/2021 at 16:02:40 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA -VS- MYHAND, JULIAN LEE

Case Summary

On 03/06/2021 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against MYHAND, JULIAN LEE. This case was filed in Alachua County Courts, Alachua County Criminal Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is COLAW, JAMES M. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***************16 A

  • Filing Date:

    03/06/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Alachua County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alachua County Criminal Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Alachua, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

COLAW, JAMES M

 

Party Details

Defendants

MYHAND, JULIAN LEE

Gainesville, FL 32641

MAYHAND, JULIAN LEE

Gainesville, FL 32641

Not Yet Classified

ALACHUA, FELONY DIVISION III

Gainesville, FL 32601

HECHAVARRIA, OMAR

Gainesville, FL 32601

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

TENNEY, JOHN W

151 Sw 2Nd Ave

Gainesville, FL 32601

Not Yet Classified Attorneys

ALACHUA, FELONY DIVISION III

120 W University Ave

Gainesville, FL 32601

HECHAVARRIA, OMAR

120 W. University Ave

Gainesville, FL 32601

 

Court Documents

ORDER DENYING MOTION TO REDUCE BOND//COLAW

03/25/2021: ORDER DENYING MOTION TO REDUCE BOND//COLAW

COURT ACTION MEMO

03/25/2021: COURT ACTION MEMO

NOTICE ISSUED TO ATTORNEY FOR DEFENDANT

03/19/2021: NOTICE ISSUED TO ATTORNEY FOR DEFENDANT

EMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

03/15/2021: EMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

MOTION FOR BOND REDUCTION

03/15/2021: MOTION FOR BOND REDUCTION

NOTICE OF HEARING

03/15/2021: NOTICE OF HEARING

NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

03/15/2021: NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

INFORMATION FILED

03/12/2021: INFORMATION FILED

ARREST FORM

03/07/2021: ARREST FORM

FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

03/07/2021: FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/08/2021
  • HearingArraignment; Judge: COLAW, JAMES M

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • HearingBond Hearing; Judge: COLAW, JAMES M; Result: HELD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER DENYING MOTION TO REDUCE BOND//COLAW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT ACTION MEMO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE ISSUED TO ATTORNEY FOR DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketCRIMINAL COURT EVENT SET; Event: Arraignment ; Date: 04/08/2021 Time: 9:00 am ; Judge: CIRCUIT, DIVISION 3 CRIMINAL Location: CJC Courtroom 3-C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR BOND REDUCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketCRIMINAL COURT EVENT SET; Event: Bond Hearing ; Date: 03/25/2021 Time: 1:30 pm ; Judge: CIRCUIT, DIVISION 3 CRIMINAL Location: CJC Courtroom 2-C; ; Result: HELD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • ChargeDRUGS-POSSESS: CNTRL SUB WO PRESCRIPTION; Charge: 1; Phase: PROS; Disposition: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketOBTS PRE-COURT ENTRY; Count: 1; PROSECUTOR PHASE; Charge Status: Same; Filing Date: 03/12/2021; Final Decision Date: 03/12/2021; Final Action: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINFORMATION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketARREST FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2021
  • DocketPROVISIONAL ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2021
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE CRIMINAL HISTORY; SUMMARY - SEE LAST PAGE OF FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer HECHAVARRIA, OMAR