Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Alachua County Courts on 06/22/2021 at 16:14:17 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA -VS- MUNGUIA, DEVIN INIKO

Case Summary

On 05/25/2021 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against MUNGUIA, DEVIN INIKO. This case was filed in Alachua County Courts, Alachua County Criminal Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***************57 A

  • Filing Date:

    05/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Alachua County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alachua County Criminal Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Alachua, Florida

 

Party Details

Defendant

MUNGUIA, DEVIN INIKO

Hawthorne, FL 32640

Not Yet Classified

ALACHUA, FELONY DIVISION III

Gainesville, FL 32601

MARGULIES, DAVID

Gainesville, FL 32601

REAVES, JOEY

Gainesville, FL 32601

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

McGill, Francis Andrew

151 Sw 2Nd Ave

Gainesville, FL 32601

Not Yet Classified Attorneys

ALACHUA, FELONY DIVISION III

120 W University Ave

Gainesville, FL 32601

MARGULIES, DAVID

120 W University Ave

Gainesville, FL 32601

 

Court Documents

SURETY BOND

06/02/2021: SURETY BOND

EMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

06/01/2021: EMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

05/25/2021: NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

STANDING NO CONTACT ORDER PER AO 4.17

05/25/2021: STANDING NO CONTACT ORDER PER AO 4.17

FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

05/25/2021: FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

ARREST FORM

05/25/2021: ARREST FORM

ORDER ON REQUEST FOR APPOINTMENT OF PUBLIC DEFENDER AND DETERMINATION OF CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS

05/25/2021: ORDER ON REQUEST FOR APPOINTMENT OF PUBLIC DEFENDER AND DETERMINATION OF CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSURETY BOND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • DocketARREST BOND ENTRY; ; Arrest Bond Added to Case with: ; Arrest Date: 05/24/2021 ; Initial Charge #: 1 ; Initial Action Code: ; Prosecutor Count #: ; Prosecutor Action Code: ; Custody Location: SURETY BOND ; Bond Status: Open ; Status Date: 06/01/2021 ; Bond Type: SURETY BOND ; Bond/Pwr No.: 2021CC006947 ; Bond Amount: $10000 ; Bonding Co.: SAM B WESLEY II BAIL BONDS ; Cash Depositor: ;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • BondCharge Number: 1; Bond Type: SURETY BOND; Bond Amount: $10,000.00; Power Number: 2021CC006947; Bond Status: Open; Bonding Company: SAM B WESLEY II BAIL BONDS; Insurance Company: LEXINGTON NATIONAL INS CORP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • FinancialTotal Fee Owed: $50.00; Total Fee Paid: $0.00; Total Fee Dismissed: $0.00; Total Fee Due: $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTANDING NO CONTACT ORDER PER AO 4.17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE CRIMINAL HISTORY; SUMMARY - SEE LAST PAGE OF FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketPROVISIONAL ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketARREST FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketASSESSMENT - CF $50 INDIGENCE APPLICATION FEE; Amount: $50.00; Amount Due: $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ON REQUEST FOR APPOINTMENT OF PUBLIC DEFENDER AND DETERMINATION OF CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MARGULIES, DAVID