Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Alachua County Courts on 02/03/2020 at 20:13:59 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA -VS- MULBERRY JR, ALBERT

Case Summary

On 03/20/2017 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against MULBERRY JR, ALBERT. This case was filed in Alachua County Courts, Alachua County Criminal Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MOSELEY, MARK W. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***************17 A

  • Filing Date:

    03/20/2017

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Alachua County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alachua County Criminal Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Alachua, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MOSELEY, MARK W

 

Party Details

Defendant

MULBERRY JR, ALBERT

Gainesville, FL 32608

Not Yet Classified

CALHOUN, GARY LAMAR

Gainesville, FL 32609

HINES, STEPHANIE

Gainesville, FL 32601

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

DEFENDER, PUBLIC

151 Sw 2Nd Ave

Gainesville, FL 32601

DOLL, LOGAN

151 Sw 2Nd Ave

Gainesville, FL 32601

Not Yet Classified Attorney

HINES, STEPHANIE

120 West University Ave

Gainesville, FL 32601

 

Court Documents

RETURNED MAIL: INSUFFICIENT ADDRESS. UNABLE TO FORWARD.

05/09/2019: RETURNED MAIL: INSUFFICIENT ADDRESS. UNABLE TO FORWARD.

SCORE SHEET

04/25/2019: SCORE SHEET

NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

04/08/2019: NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

AFFIDAVIT - VIOLATION OF PROBATION

03/05/2019: AFFIDAVIT - VIOLATION OF PROBATION

AMENDED ORDER ESTABLISHING MONETARY SUMS // NUNC PRO TUNC 09122018 // DAVIS

09/17/2018: AMENDED ORDER ESTABLISHING MONETARY SUMS // NUNC PRO TUNC 09122018 // DAVIS

ORDER ESTABLISHING MONETARY SUMS // DAVIS

09/12/2018: ORDER ESTABLISHING MONETARY SUMS // DAVIS

CIVIL LIEN RESTITUTION ORDER IN THE AMOUNT OF $50.00 // DAVIS

09/12/2018: CIVIL LIEN RESTITUTION ORDER IN THE AMOUNT OF $50.00 // DAVIS

RESTITUTION ORDER - NOT APPLICABLE// DAVIS

09/12/2018: RESTITUTION ORDER - NOT APPLICABLE// DAVIS

HEARING NOTES

09/12/2018: HEARING NOTES

DISCHARGE OF BOND FORFEITURE BY CLERK OF COURT /@

07/19/2018: DISCHARGE OF BOND FORFEITURE BY CLERK OF COURT /@

ARREST FORM

07/13/2018: ARREST FORM

MOTION TO COMPEL

05/01/2018: MOTION TO COMPEL

DEFENDANT SIGNED NOTICE

04/05/2018: DEFENDANT SIGNED NOTICE

DEFENDANT SIGNED NOTICE FOR CASE MANAGEMENT

03/15/2018: DEFENDANT SIGNED NOTICE FOR CASE MANAGEMENT

DEFENDANT SIGNED NOTICE FOR CASE MANAGEMENT

02/15/2018: DEFENDANT SIGNED NOTICE FOR CASE MANAGEMENT

NOTICE ISSUED TO BOND AGENT

07/14/2017: NOTICE ISSUED TO BOND AGENT

COURT ACTION MEMO

07/13/2017: COURT ACTION MEMO

SURETY BOND

03/23/2017: SURETY BOND

87 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/25/2019
  • DocketCASE (LIEN) FORWARDED TO COLLECTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • DocketCOLLECTIONS RECORD STAGED WITH LIEN AMOUNT OF $1223.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURNED MAIL: INSUFFICIENT ADDRESS. UNABLE TO FORWARD.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • DocketMONETARY OBLIGATIONS AUDITED//hap

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFIED COPY OF CIVIL JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL JUDGMENT ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • DocketAUDITED FOR CIVIL LIEN PURPOSES -$1,223.00 SENT TO JUDGE FOR SIGNATURE//JMC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • DocketOIEN BATCH RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • HearingArraignment for VOP; Judge: MOSELEY, MARK W; Result: HELD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • DocketASSESSMENT - CF ATTORNEY FEES, NO APPLICATION FILED; Amount: $100.00; Amount Due: $100.00

    Read MoreRead Less
152 More Docket Entries
  • 03/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSURETY BOND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2017
  • BondCharge Number: 1; Bond Type: SURETY BOND; Bond Amount: $15,000.00; Power Number: AB17114117; Bond Status: Open; Bonding Company: GARY CALHOUN BAIL BOND; Insurance Company: ROCHE SURETY & CASUALTY CO.INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • DocketASSESSMENT - CF $50 INDIGENCE APPLICATION FEE; Amount: $50.00; Amount Due: $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENT STATUS (INDIGENT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • FinancialTotal Fee Owed: $1,273.00; Total Fee Paid: $0.00; Total Fee Dismissed: $50.00; Total Fee Due: $1,223.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTANDING NO CONTACT ORDER PER AO 4.17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • DocketPROVISIONAL ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE CRIMINAL HISTORY; SUMMARY - SEE LAST PAGE OF FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketARREST FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer DOLL, LOGAN