Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Alachua County Courts on 03/25/2021 at 16:31:04 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA -VS- MOULTRIE, VENETTIA SHA NAILE

Case Summary

On 02/24/2021 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against MOULTRIE, VENETTIA SHA NAILE. This case was filed in Alachua County Courts, Alachua County Criminal Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***************91 A

  • Filing Date:

    02/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Alachua County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alachua County Criminal Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Alachua, Florida

 

Party Details

Defendant

MOULTRIE, VENETTIA SHA NAILE

Gainesville, FL 32609

Not Yet Classified

ALACHUA, FELONY DIVISION III

Gainesville, FL 32601

MARGULIES, DAVID

Gainesville, FL 32601

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

LIMOGE, VALERIE L

151 Sw 2Nd Ave

Gainesville, FL 32601

RUPPERT ESQ, MICHAEL

500 E University Ave Ste E

Gainesville, FL 32601

Not Yet Classified Attorneys

ALACHUA, FELONY DIVISION III

120 W University Ave

Gainesville, FL 32601

MARGULIES, DAVID

120 W University Ave

Gainesville, FL 32601

 

Court Documents

ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO WITHDRAW & APPOINTING CONFLICT ATTORNEY

03/15/2021: ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO WITHDRAW & APPOINTING CONFLICT ATTORNEY

CERTIFICATION OF CONFLICT OF INTEREST BETWEEN THE DEFENDANTS

03/12/2021: CERTIFICATION OF CONFLICT OF INTEREST BETWEEN THE DEFENDANTS

MOTION TO WITHDRAW

03/12/2021: MOTION TO WITHDRAW

ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO WITHDRAW AND APPOINTING REGIONAL COUNSEL

03/12/2021: ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO WITHDRAW AND APPOINTING REGIONAL COUNSEL

ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO WITHDRAW AND APPOINTING REGIONAL COUNSEL

03/12/2021: ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO WITHDRAW AND APPOINTING REGIONAL COUNSEL

MOTION TO WITHDRAW

03/11/2021: MOTION TO WITHDRAW

CERTIFICATION OF CONFLICT OF INTEREST BETWEEN THE DEFENDANTS

03/11/2021: CERTIFICATION OF CONFLICT OF INTEREST BETWEEN THE DEFENDANTS

EMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

03/03/2021: EMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

02/24/2021: NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

ORDER ON REQUEST FOR APPOINTMENT OF PUBLIC DEFENDER AND DETERMINATION OF CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS

02/24/2021: ORDER ON REQUEST FOR APPOINTMENT OF PUBLIC DEFENDER AND DETERMINATION OF CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS

STANDING NO CONTACT ORDER PER AO 4.17

02/24/2021: STANDING NO CONTACT ORDER PER AO 4.17

FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

02/24/2021: FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

ARREST FORM

02/24/2021: ARREST FORM

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER GRANTING MOTION TO WITHDRAW & APPOINTING CONFLICT ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATION OF CONFLICT OF INTEREST BETWEEN THE DEFENDANTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO WITHDRAW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER GRANTING MOTION TO WITHDRAW AND APPOINTING REGIONAL COUNSEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER GRANTING MOTION TO WITHDRAW AND APPOINTING REGIONAL COUNSEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO WITHDRAW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATION OF CONFLICT OF INTEREST BETWEEN THE DEFENDANTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • FinancialTotal Fee Owed: $50.00; Total Fee Paid: $0.00; Total Fee Dismissed: $0.00; Total Fee Due: $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • DocketASSESSMENT - CF $50 INDIGENCE APPLICATION FEE; Amount: $50.00; Amount Due: $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ON REQUEST FOR APPOINTMENT OF PUBLIC DEFENDER AND DETERMINATION OF CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTANDING NO CONTACT ORDER PER AO 4.17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE CRIMINAL HISTORY; SUMMARY - SEE LAST PAGE OF FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • DocketPROVISIONAL ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketARREST FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MARGULIES, DAVID