Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Alachua County Courts on 04/20/2021 at 16:07:52 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA -VS- MORRIS, JOEL BRYAN

Case Summary

On 03/22/2021 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against MORRIS, JOEL BRYAN. This case was filed in Alachua County Courts, Alachua County Criminal Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***************43 A

  • Filing Date:

    03/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Alachua County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alachua County Criminal Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Alachua, Florida

 

Party Details

Defendant

MORRIS, JOEL BRYAN

Gainesville, FL 32609

Not Yet Classified

ALACHUA, FELONY DIVISION III

Gainesville, FL 32601

MARGULIES, DAVID

Gainesville, FL 32601

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

LIMOGE, VALERIE L

151 Sw 2Nd Ave

Gainesville, FL 32601

Not Yet Classified Attorneys

ALACHUA, FELONY DIVISION III

120 W University Ave

Gainesville, FL 32601

MARGULIES, DAVID

120 W University Ave

Gainesville, FL 32601

 

Court Documents

FELONY GUILTY - JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE

04/15/2021: FELONY GUILTY - JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE

ORDER ESTABLISHING MONETARY SUMS /@

04/15/2021: ORDER ESTABLISHING MONETARY SUMS /@

COURT ACTION MEMO

04/15/2021: COURT ACTION MEMO

RESTITUTION ORDER - NOT APPLICABLE//@

04/15/2021: RESTITUTION ORDER - NOT APPLICABLE//@

VICTIM NOTIFICATION DATA SHEET

04/15/2021: VICTIM NOTIFICATION DATA SHEET

SCORE SHEET

04/15/2021: SCORE SHEET

PETITION TO ENTER PLEA GUILTY OR NOLO//ACCEPTED//@

04/15/2021: PETITION TO ENTER PLEA GUILTY OR NOLO//ACCEPTED//@

INFORMATION FILED

04/14/2021: INFORMATION FILED

STATE'S DISCOVERY EXHIBIT

04/14/2021: STATE'S DISCOVERY EXHIBIT

EMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

03/31/2021: EMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

ORDER ON REQUEST FOR APPOINTMENT OF PUBLIC DEFENDER AND DETERMINATION OF CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS

03/23/2021: ORDER ON REQUEST FOR APPOINTMENT OF PUBLIC DEFENDER AND DETERMINATION OF CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS

NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

03/23/2021: NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

STANDING NO CONTACT ORDER PER AO 4.17

03/23/2021: STANDING NO CONTACT ORDER PER AO 4.17

FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

03/23/2021: FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

UNIFORM TRAFFIC CITATION FILED #AEI444E

03/23/2021: UNIFORM TRAFFIC CITATION FILED #AEI444E

ARREST FORM

03/23/2021: ARREST FORM

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketCASE AUDITED FOR CIVIL LIEN PURPOSES - $671.00 LIEN SENT TO JUDGE FOR SIGNATURE//HAP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • ChargeDRIV WHILE LIC SUSPEND REVOCATION EQUIV STATUS; Charge: 3; Phase: COURT; Disposition: Guilty Adjudication

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • ChargeDRUGS-POSSESS: CNTRL SUB WO PRESCRIPTION; Charge: 2; Phase: COURT; Disposition: Guilty Adjudication

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • ChargeDRUGS-POSSESS: CNTRL SUB WO PRESCRIPTION; Charge: 1; Phase: COURT; Disposition: Guilty Adjudication

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFELONY GUILTY - JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketOIEN BATCH RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketASSESSMENT - CF ATTORNEY FEES; Amount: $100.00; Amount Due: $100.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketASSESSMENT - CF STATE ATTY COST OF PROSECUTION; Amount: $100.00; Amount Due: $100.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketASSESSMENT - $2 CF LCL LW ENFORCEMENT ; Charge #1: DRUGS-POSSESS: CNTRL SUB WO PRESCRIPTION; Amount: $2.00; Amount Due: $2.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketASSESSMENT - $419 CF BASE COSTS; Amount: $419.00; Amount Due: $419.00

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ON REQUEST FOR APPOINTMENT OF PUBLIC DEFENDER AND DETERMINATION OF CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketDRIVING RECORD, DPPA-COMPLIANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTANDING NO CONTACT ORDER PER AO 4.17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE CRIMINAL HISTORY; SUMMARY - SEE LAST PAGE OF FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketPROVISIONAL ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUNIFORM TRAFFIC CITATION FILED #AEI444E

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketARREST FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • FinancialTotal Fee Owed: $671.00; Total Fee Paid: $0.00; Total Fee Dismissed: $0.00; Total Fee Due: $671.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer LIMOGE, VALERIE L